This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 08:29:02 (UTC).

Gordon v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Gordon filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00060

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathryn E Gordon

Katherine E Gordon

Defendants

Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC

PHH Mortgage Corporation

US Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sherry L Doyle

Attorney at Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma

2915 North Classen Blvd., Suite 200, 73106

Oklahoma City, OK 73013-5308

Sandra G Williams

Attorney at Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma

2227 W. Lindsey, Suite 1550

Norman, OK 73071

Defendant Attorneys

Adam R Nunnallee

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC - DALLAS

1717 Main St, Suite 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark E Hardin

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-TULSA

907 S Detroit, Suite 815

Tulsa, OK 74120

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Gordon v Ocwen Docket

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Gordon's Original Petition

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons to Ocwen

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Original Answer

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance for Defendants

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Appraisal (Gordon)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn E Gordon. All Defendants. (Williams, Sandra) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A: Pooling and Servicing Agreement

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Nunnallee, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants and Certificate of Interested Persons. (Nunnallee, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Remand to State Court Accordingly, there is complete diversity and the motion to remand is not well taken, as more fully set out. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 3/10/22. (jw) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Remand to State Court Accordingly, there is complete diversity and the motion to remand is not well taken, as more fully set out. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 3/10/22. (jw) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants and Certificate of Interested Persons. (Nunnallee, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Nunnallee, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kathryn E Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Pooling and Servicing Agreement)(Williams, Sandra) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn E Gordon. All Defendants. (Williams, Sandra) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:22-cv-00060-R Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3837002. (Nunnallee, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CV-2021-2732 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, US Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Gordon v Ocwen Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gordon's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons to Ocwen, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Original Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance for Defendants, #6 Exhibit 6 - Appraisal (Gordon), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHH Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Hardin