This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:34:16 (UTC).

GORDON v. MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 GORDON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J FRANK and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCUS GORDON

Defendants

LESTER JAMES

MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONNY ALLEN OWENS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN - JACKSONVILLE FL

76 S Laura St, Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER BARKAS

Attorney at CARR ALLISON - TALLAHASSEE FL

305 S Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

STEPHEN KYLE WEAVER

Attorney at CARR ALLISON - TALLAHASSEE FL

305 S Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MARCUS GORDON. (OWENS, DONNY) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC from GADSDEN COUNTY, FL, CIRCUIT COURT, case number 2019-CA-001128. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4764690.), filed by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C) (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit C

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC. (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REMANDING CASE - re: #1 Notice of Removal. This Court lacks jurisdiction to consider this case. The Clerk shall take all necessary action to remand this action to the Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Gadsden County, Florida. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/25/2020. (cle) *** Case sent to Second Judicial Circuit - Gadsden County. *** (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Status Report due by 2/7/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/20/2020. Discovery due by 5/10/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/7/2020. (cle) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REMANDING CASE - re: #1 Notice of Removal. This Court lacks jurisdiction to consider this case. The Clerk shall take all necessary action to remand this action to the Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Gadsden County, Florida. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/25/2020. (cle) *** Case sent to Second Judicial Circuit - Gadsden County. *** (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC. (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MARCUS GORDON. (OWENS, DONNY) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Status Report due by 2/7/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/20/2020. Discovery due by 5/10/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/7/2020. (cle) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC from GADSDEN COUNTY, FL, CIRCUIT COURT, case number 2019-CA-001128. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4764690.), filed by LESTER JAMES, MEDALLION TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C) (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.