This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2021 at 09:58:15 (UTC).

Gordon v. Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Gordon filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03544

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alisha L. Gordon

Shrewsbury, PA 17356

Defendant

Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Susan Howe Baron

Attorney at State of Maryland Office of the Attorney General

300 E. Joppa Road, Suite 1000

Towson, MD 21286

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baron, Susan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Howe Baron on behalf of Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services (Baron, Susan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

5 #2

Waiver of Service Form

5 #1

USMS Form

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services. (Attachments: #1 USMS Form, #2 Waiver of Service Form) (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Alisha L. Gordon re #1 Complaint, (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order in which to complete the summons and Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk and to provide service copies of the Complaint as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/17/2020. (c/m as directed 12/18/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services filed by Alisha L. Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #4 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baron, Susan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Howe Baron on behalf of Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services (Baron, Susan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services. (Attachments: #1 USMS Form, #2 Waiver of Service Form) (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Alisha L. Gordon re #1 Complaint, (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order in which to complete the summons and Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk and to provide service copies of the Complaint as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/17/2020. (c/m as directed 12/18/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alisha L. Gordon. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services filed by Alisha L. Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #4 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services (DPSCS) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan Howe Baron