This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 09:41:47 (UTC).

Gordon v. First Chicago Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Gordon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Chicago Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03195

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ella Joe Gordon

Springfield, IL 62703

Defendants

Donnell Cole

First Chicago Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Beth Clemens Boggs

Attorney at BRINKER & DOYEN LLP

5Th Floor, 34 N. Meramec Avenue

Clayton, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RULE 12(C) NOTICE to Plaintiff re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (MJC, ilcd) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit B

#11

(#11) MOTION for Sanctions Under F.R.C.P. Rule 11 by Defendant First Chicago Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant First Chicago Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit B

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant First Chicago Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Beth Clemens Boggs on behalf of First Chicago Insurance Company (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Chicago Insurance Company. First Chicago Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Donnell Cole on 8/13/2020. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to First Chicago Insurance Company on 8/13/2020. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

4 #9

Exhibit

4 #7

Exhibit

4 #4

Exhibit

4 #2

Exhibit

#4

(#4) Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Ella Joe Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(MJC, ilcd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #1

proposed summons

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 12(C) NOTICE to Plaintiff re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (MJC, ilcd) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Sanctions Under F.R.C.P. Rule 11 by Defendant First Chicago Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant First Chicago Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant First Chicago Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Beth Clemens Boggs on behalf of First Chicago Insurance Company (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Chicago Insurance Company. First Chicago Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Donnell Cole on 8/13/2020. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to First Chicago Insurance Company on 8/13/2020. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Ella Joe Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(MJC, ilcd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Pro se Plaintiff is given leave to renew her Motion to Request Counsel after she demonstrates that she has made reasonable efforts to find counsel on her own. This typically requires writing to several lawyers and giving their responses to the Court. If Plaintiff renews her motion, she should set forth how far she has gone in school, any jobs she has held inside and outside of prison, any classes she has taken in prison, and any prior litigation experience she has. Entered on 8/12/2020. (MJC, ilcd) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Before the Court is pro se Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel #3 . The Court notes that civil litigants have no constitutional or statutory right to be represented by counsel in federal court. Zarnes v. Rhodes, 64 F.3d 285, 288 (7th Cir., 1995). The decision to appoint counsel lies within the broad discretion of the Court. Jackson v. County of McLean, 953 F.2d 1070, 1071 (7th Cir., 1992). The Court concludes that appointment of counsel is not warranted in this case at this time. The Plaintiff has alleged no physical or mental disability that might preclude her from adequately investigating the facts giving rise to her Complaint. The Plaintiff appears to be capable of presenting her case. The Plaintiff has not shown any attempt to retain counsel. The Court grants pro se litigants wide latitude in the handling of their lawsuits. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel #3 is DENIED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 8/10/2020. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins.Before the Court is the pro se Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send notice of lawsuit waiver of service forms to the Defendants at the addresses provided by Plaintiff along with a copy of the Complaint, two copies of the waiver form, and a prepaid envelope to return the form by first class mail to the Clerk. If a Defendant fails to sign and return a waiver within 30 days from the date said forms were sent, the Court will direct personal service by the U.S. Marshal at the Defendant's expense. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 8/10/2020. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Ella Joe Gordon. Responses due by 8/14/2020 (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ella Joe Gordon. Responses due by 8/14/2020 (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Donnell Cole, First Chicago Insurance Company, filed by Ella Joe Gordon. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons, #2 envelope)(ME, ilcd) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Chicago Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beth C. Boggs