This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2019 at 07:30:15 (UTC).

Gordon v. DH Pace Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Gordon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DH Pace Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are James O. Browning and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Gordon

Defendants

Wal Mart, Inc.

DH Pace Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Houliston

Attorney at The Law Offices of David M Houliston

7500 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 106

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Ann Martinez

Attorney at Modrall, Sperling, Roehl, Harris & Sisk, PA

Post Office Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 84102

Megan Muirhead

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.

P. O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

John S. Stiff

Attorney at John S. Stiff & Associates, LLC

400 Gold Avenue, Sw, Suite 1300W

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/5/2019. (mm) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) NOTICE by DH Pace Company, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stiff, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DH Pace Company, Inc. Amended (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DH Pace Company, Inc. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant DH Pace Company, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Stiff on behalf of DH Pace Company, Inc. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DH Pace Company, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-03260. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#11) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt VACATING Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The telephonic Rule 16(c) Conference set for April 8, 2019, is hereby VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#10) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/5/2019. (mm) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by DH Pace Company, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stiff, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DH Pace Company, Inc. Amended (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DH Pace Company, Inc. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant DH Pace Company, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Stiff on behalf of DH Pace Company, Inc. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6225768 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DH Pace Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DH Pace Company, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-03260. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stiff, John) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.