This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2019 at 07:33:34 (UTC).

GORCHOCK v. AECOM C&E, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 GORCHOCK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AECOM C E, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01329

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL GORCHOCK

Defendants

AECOM CONSULT, INC.

AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC.

ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10)

AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC.

AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

URS CORPORATION

AECOM POWER E&C, INC.

AECOM SERVICES, INC.

AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC.

AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC

AECOM C&E, INC.

AECOM USA, INC.

AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC

AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC.

AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

URS CORPORATION SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Urick

Attorney at McMillen, Urick, Tocci & Jones

2131 Brodhead Road

Aliquippa, PA 15001

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Joseph Coles

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

501 Grant Street, Suite 850

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Kevin M. Eddy

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

501 Grant Street, Suite 805

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Ricky M Guerra

Attorney at Blank Rome

130 N. 18Th Street, One Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have an extension up to and including 1/15/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/29/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AECOM USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coles, Amy) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Merit by Richard Urick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Urick, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/1/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (mao) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/23/2019. (kly) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/23/2019) (kly) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky M Guerra on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Guerra, Ricky) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM USA, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., URS CORPORATION, AECOM CONSULT, INC. Answer due from URS CORPORATION SERVICES on 12/6/2019; AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM USA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM C&E, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC on 12/6/2019; AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM POWER E&C, INC. on 12/6/2019; URS CORPORATION on 12/6/2019; AECOM CONSULT, INC. on 12/6/2019. (Coles, Amy) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Coles, Amy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Eddy on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Eddy, Kevin) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny, case number GD-19-012308 with BOTH Copies attached: LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, DOCKET SHEET FROM BEAVER COUNTY, EXHIBITS, DECLARATIONS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5323095), filed by ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10), AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM USA, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., URS CORPORATION, AECOM CONSULT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (jd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC is a litigant