This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:10:28 (UTC).

Gorbey v. Spaulding et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Gorbey filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Spaulding. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CA and Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01457

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CA

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Defendants

United States

S. Spaulding

 

Court Documents

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) Modified on 10/8/2020 (lp). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#14

(#14) Continuance Page to Support Imminent Danger by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#13

(#13) 15 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO WARDEN.Issued on 9/17/2020. (bg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#12

(#12) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION Omnibus filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION Omnibus by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Amend Joint #1 Complaint Bivens Action by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#6

(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Mariani filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Recusal of Judge Mariani by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

4 #1

IFP (civil rights)

#4

(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

3 #4

398 Form

3 #3

Federal & Local Rules

3 #2

Instruction Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT "Owl-Feather-Gorbey Bivens-Federal Tort Claim Act lawsuit Under Imminent Danger against S. Spaulding, United States lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey.(lp) Modified on 8/18/2020 (lp). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) Modified on 10/8/2020 (lp). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Continuance Page to Support Imminent Danger by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 15 mailed to Warden on 9/17/2020 (bg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 15 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO WARDEN.Issued on 9/17/2020. (bg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION Omnibus filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION Omnibus by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Amend Joint #1 Complaint Bivens Action by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Mariani filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Recusal of Judge Mariani by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form, #5 399 Form) (lp) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to proceed in forma pauperis (incorrect form for civil right cases).. (lp) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT "Owl-Feather-Gorbey Bivens-Federal Tort Claim Act lawsuit Under Imminent Danger against S. Spaulding, United States lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey.(lp) Modified on 8/18/2020 (lp). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less