This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2020 at 11:52:50 (UTC).

Goodwin v. Medtronic, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Goodwin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01732

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danny Goodwin

Danny Goodwin, Jr.

Defendants

Medtronic Logistics, LLC

Medtronic Inc

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations

Medtronic USA Inc

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc.

Medtronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey A. Cheek

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ellen A. Presby

Attorney at Van Wey, Presby, & Williams, PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75230

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole M. Boyer

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Kelly Cambre Bogart

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

8 #1

PHV Notice

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ellen A. Presby. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

7 #3

Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellen A. Presby (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-8413747) by Danny Goodwin, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 7/23/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc., Medtronic USA Inc, Medtronic, Inc. (Bogart, Kelly) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC answer due 9/8/2020; Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc. answer due 9/8/2020; Medtronic USA Inc answer due 9/8/2020; Medtronic, Inc. answer due 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/8/2020. (sbs) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

1 #15

Exhibit

1 #14

Exhibit

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8355753) filed by Danny Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)Attorney Lindsey A. Cheek added to party Danny Goodwin (pty:pla).(Cheek, Lindsey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/16/2020) (sbs). (WAIVER OF SERVICE) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ellen A. Presby. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellen A. Presby (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-8413747) by Danny Goodwin, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 7/23/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc., Medtronic USA Inc, Medtronic, Inc. (Bogart, Kelly) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC answer due 9/8/2020; Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc. answer due 9/8/2020; Medtronic USA Inc answer due 9/8/2020; Medtronic, Inc. answer due 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/8/2020. (sbs) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Kelly Cambre Bogart added to party Medtronic Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Cambre Bogart added to party Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Cambre Bogart added to party Medtronic USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Cambre Bogart added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bogart, Kelly) Modified text on 7/9/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Medtronic Logistics, LLC on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Inc. on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Medtronic USA Inc on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Medtronic, Inc. on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8355753) filed by Danny Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)Attorney Lindsey A. Cheek added to party Danny Goodwin (pty:pla).(Cheek, Lindsey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/16/2020) (sbs). (WAIVER OF SERVICE) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant