This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 10:37:06 (UTC).

Goodwin, Jr. v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Goodwin, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Kernodle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00528

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Goodwin, Jr.

Defendants

Medtronic Logistics, LLC

Medtronic USA, Inc.,

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co.

Medtronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Jean Baughman

Attorney at Baron & Budd, PC - Dallas

3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219-4281

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Medtronic Logistics, LLC. Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. Medtronic USA, Inc., waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. Medtronic, Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

2 #3

Summons(es)

2 #2

Summons(es)

2 #1

Summons(es)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Medtronic USA, Inc.,, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es)) (ndc) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit FDA, Recall No. Z-1570-2014

1 #9

Exhibit Letter from Mike Ronningen (Aug. 2017)

1 #8

Exhibit FDA Recall No. Z-0896-2018

1 #7

Exhibit FDA Form 483 (Apr 3, 2013)

1 #6

Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (July 17, 2012)

1 #5

Exhibit FDA Form 483 (Dec 15, 2008)

1 #4

Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (June 1, 2009)

1 #3

Exhibit FDA Form 483 (Jan 24, 2007)

1 #2

Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (July 3, 2007)

1 #1

Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (Aug 29, 2006)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Medtronic Logistics, LLC. Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. Medtronic USA, Inc., waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. Medtronic, Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/3/2021. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Medtronic USA, Inc.,, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es)) (ndc) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8031699.), filed by Danny Goodwin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (Aug 29, 2006), #2 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (July 3, 2007), #3 Exhibit FDA Form 483 (Jan 24, 2007), #4 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (June 1, 2009), #5 Exhibit FDA Form 483 (Dec 15, 2008), #6 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter (July 17, 2012), #7 Exhibit FDA Form 483 (Apr 3, 2013), #8 Exhibit FDA Recall No. Z-0896-2018, #9 Exhibit Letter from Mike Ronningen (Aug. 2017), #10 Exhibit FDA, Recall No. Z-1570-2014, #11 Exhibit Letter from Mike Cader (Mar 2014), #12 Exhibit FDA, Recall No. Z-1570-2013, Z-1571-2013, Z-1579-2013, Z-0788-2017, #13 Exhibit Intentionally Left Blank, #14 Exhibit Intentionally Left Blank, #15 Exhibit Complaint for Permanent Injunction, #16 Exhibit Consent Decree for Permanent Injunction, #17 Exhibit Intentionally Left Blank, #18 Exhibit Misc. Dkt No. 20-9071, Twelfth Emergency Order 5, #19 Exhibit Misc. Dkt No. 20-9071, Seventeenth Emergency Order 2-3., #20 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Baughman