This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:38:39 (UTC).

Goodvine, Christopher v. Lavoie, Daniel et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Goodvine, Christopher filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lavoie, Daniel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher A. Goodvine

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

Dr. Daniel Lavoie

Dr. Murphy

Ms. Block

Ms. Fofana

Rachel Snow

Kera Haase

Rose Howell

Denise Valerius

Dr. Daniel La Voie

Dr. James Murphy

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Motion for Treatment by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#6

(#6) Motion to Correct Docket, Alternatively, Letter to Clerk by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#5

(#5) Declaration in Support of #3 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine (jef),(ps) Declaration originally filed at dkt. 6 in case 22-cv-284-jdp. (jef) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#4

(#4) Brief in Support of #3 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) Brief originally filed at dkt. 5 in case 22-cv-284-jdp. (jef) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) Motion originally filed at dkt. 4 in case 22-cv-284-jdp. (jef) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

2 #19

Exhibit 019 - Health Service Requests

2 #18

Exhibit 018 - Letter to Dr. Ribault Dated 11/15/20

2 #17

Exhibit 017 - Letter from Dr. Ribault dated 09/21/20

2 #15

Exhibit 015 - Off-Site Service Request and Reports and Prescription Order

2 #13

Exhibit 013 - Letter from Health Service Nursing Coordinator Rachel Snow Dated

2 #12

Exhibit 012 - Letter Sent to Warden Fuchs on 03/03/22 (Very Faint)

2 #11

Exhibit 011 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 03/10/22

2 #8

Exhibit 008 - Health Service Requests

2 #7

Exhibit 007 - Letter dated 03/13/22 Regarding Meloxicam

2 #6

Exhibit 006 - To be Filed Separately

2 #3

Exhibit 003 - Health Service Request and Letter from Health Service Unit Dated

2 #2

Exhibit 002 - Patient Education Instructions Regarding Meloxicam Oral Tablet

2 #2

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Treatment by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Correct Docket, Alternatively, Letter to Clerk by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration in Support of #3 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine (jef),(ps) Declaration originally filed at dkt. 6 in case 22-cv-284-jdp. (jef) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Brief in Support of #3 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) Brief originally filed at dkt. 5 in case 22-cv-284-jdp. (jef) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine. (jef),(ps) Motion originally filed at dkt. 4 in case 22-cv-284-jdp. (jef) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPLRA / In Forma Pauperis Screening. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT (from case no. 22-cv-284-jdp) against All Defendants, filed by Christopher A. Goodvine. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/06/21 and Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 002 - Patient Education Instructions Regarding Meloxicam Oral Tablet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Health Service Request and Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/21/21, #4 Exhibit 004 - Complaint Number CCI-2021-16330 Documents, #5 Exhibit 005 - Health Service Requests, #6 Exhibit 006 - To be Filed Separately, #7 Exhibit 007 - Letter dated 03/13/22 Regarding Meloxicam, #8 Exhibit 008 - Health Service Requests, #9 Exhibit 009 - Health Service Requests, #10 Exhibit 010 - Letters from Health Service Unit Dated 02/18/22 and 03/03/2022 and Interview/Information Request, #11 Exhibit 011 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 03/10/22, #12 Exhibit 012 - Letter Sent to Warden Fuchs on 03/03/22 (Very Faint), #13 Exhibit 013 - Letter from Health Service Nursing Coordinator Rachel Snow Dated 03/30/22 and Interview/Information Request, #14 Exhibit 014 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 02/19/22, #15 Exhibit 015 - Off-Site Service Request and Reports and Prescription Order, #16 Exhibit 016 - Off-Site Service Request and Report and Ascension Mercy Hospital Radiology Report, #17 Exhibit 017 - Letter from Dr. Ribault dated 09/21/20, #18 Exhibit 018 - Letter to Dr. Ribault Dated 11/15/20, #19 Exhibit 019 - Health Service Requests) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER from case 22-cv-284-jdp that plaintiff Christopher Goodvine and Matthew Labrec's claims are SEVERED. Labrec's case will proceed under case number 22-cv-284. The clerk of court is directed to open a new case for Goodvine that includes the following defendants: Daniel Lavoie, Dr. Murphy, Ms. Block, Ms. Fofana, Rachel Snow, Kera Haase, Rose Howell, and Denise Valerius. Defendants Block, Fofana, Snow, Haase, Howell, and Valerius are DISMISSED from this case because Labrec hasn't asserted any claims against them. The claims of each plaintiff will be screened in separate orders. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/7/2022. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy, as he is the Chapter 7 Trustee of Pagliaro is a litigant

Latest cases where CCI Prison Facility is a litigant