This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2022 at 09:14:15 (UTC).

LaBrec, Matthew v. Lavoie, Daniel et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 LaBrec, Matthew filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lavoie, Daniel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen L. Crocker and James D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew LaBrec

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

Dr. Daniel Lavoie

Dr. Ribault

Ms. Kramer

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Gesina S. Carson

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Kevin L Grzebielski

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7857, 17 W. Main Street

Madison, WI 53707

 

Court Documents

24 #15

Exhibit 16 - refiling due to missing page - Off-Site Service Request and Report

24 #12

Exhibit 12 - Progress Notes

24 #10

Exhibit 10 - Health Service Request

24 #8

Exhibit 8 - Health Service Requests

24 #7

Exhibit 7 - Prescriber's Orders

24 #6

Exhibit 6 - Progress Notes

24 #5

Exhibit 5 - Medications, Health Services rejection letter

24 #4

Exhibit 4 - Off-site Service Request, EMG/NCS Lab results

24 #3

Exhibit 3 - Off-site Service Request, order sheet, after visit summary

6 #15

Exhibit 015 - Off-Site Service Request and Reports and Prescription Order

6 #14

Exhibit 014 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 02/19/22

6 #8

Exhibit 008 - Health Service Requests

6 #6

Exhibit 006 - To be Filed Separetely

#5

(#5) Brief in Support of #4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiffs Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#4

(#6) Declaration in Support of #4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/06/21 and Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 002 - Patient Education Instructions Regarding Meloxicam Oral Tablet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Health Service Request and Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/21/21, #4 Exhibit 004 - Complaint Number CCI-2021-16330 Documents, #5 Exhibit 005 - Health Service Requests, #6 Exhibit 006 - To be Filed Separately, #7 Exhibit 007 - Letter dated 03/13/22 Regarding Meloxicam, #8 Exhibit 008 - Health Service Requests, #9 Exhibit 009 - Health Service Requests, #10 Exhibit 010 - Letters from Health Service Unit Dated 02/18/22 and 03/03/2022 and Interview/Information Request, #11 Exhibit 011 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 03/10/22, #12 Exhibit 012 - Letter Sent to Warden Fuchs on 03/03/22 (Very Faint), #13 Exhibit 013 - Letter from Health Service Nursing Coordinator Rachel Snow Dated 03/30/22 and Interview/Information Request, #14 Exhibit 014 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 02/19/22, #15 Exhibit 015 - Off-Site Service Request and Reports and Prescription Order, #16 Exhibit 016 - Off-Site Service Request and Report and Ascension Mercy Hospital Radiology Report, #17 Exhibit 017 - Letter from Dr. Ribault dated 09/21/20, #18 Exhibit 018 - Letter to Dr. Ribault Dated 11/15/20, #19 Exhibit 019 - Health Service Requests) (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Sworn Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff is proceeding on several claims against multiple defendants regarding his medical care in prison. He has now submitted an amended complaint that doesn't simply add new defendants and new claims; it also changes the structure and the narrative of the original complaint. Dkt. #24 . This makes it more difficult to determine what changes plaintiff intended to make. To assist with screening the amended complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915A, plaintiff may have until July 26, 2022, to submit a short brief that includes the following information: (1) what claims plaintiff is attempting to add to the case; (2) whether he is seeking reconsideration of any the claims I dismissed in the original screening order, and, if so, what new allegations support those claims; and (3) whether he is continuing to assert all of the claims on which I allowed him to proceed, and, if not, which claims he wishes to dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/13/2022. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Letter from plaintiff requesting to attach exhibits 15, 17, 18 and 19 from dkt. 1 to the Amended Complaint and providing medical authorization. (Attachments: #1 Authorization and Informed Consent for Use and Disclosure of Medical Information) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Intake Screening and Medical History, #2 Exhibit 2 - Off-site Service Request and Report, MRI Screening Form, Radiology Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Off-site Service Request, order sheet, after visit summary, #4 Exhibit 4 - Off-site Service Request, EMG/NCS Lab results, #5 Exhibit 5 - Medications, Health Services rejection letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Progress Notes, #7 Exhibit 7 - Prescriber's Orders, #8 Exhibit 8 - Health Service Requests, #9 Exhibit 9 - Health Service Request, #10 Exhibit 10 - Health Service Request, #11 Exhibit 11 - Gabapentin information, #12 Exhibit 12 - Progress Notes, #13 Exhibit 13 - Inmate Complaint documents, #14 Exhibit 14 - Inmate Complaint documents, #15 Exhibit 16 - refiling due to missing page - Off-Site Service Request and Report and Ascension Mercy Hospital Radiology Report) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jef/jmm),(ps) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin L Grzebielski for Defendants Kramer, Daniel Lavoie, Ribault. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Kramer, Daniel Lavoie, Ribault. (Carson, Gesina),(ps) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendants Kramer, Daniel Lavoie, Ribault. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Carson, Gesina),(ps) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Ribault, Kramer, Daniel Lavoie. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/15/2022. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Warden PLRA Letter as to Matthew LaBrec. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketJudge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that Plaintiff Goodvine submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/19/2022. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on ifp request for Plaintiff LaBrec: Initial partial filing fee of $ 113.71 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/19/2022. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec (Attachments: #1 Copy of Interview/Information Request, #2 Copy of Disbursement Request, #3 IPP Calculation) (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration in Support of #4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/06/21 and Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 002 - Patient Education Instructions Regarding Meloxicam Oral Tablet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Health Service Request and Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/21/21, #4 Exhibit 004 - Complaint Number CCI-2021-16330 Documents, #5 Exhibit 005 - Health Service Requests, #6 Exhibit 006 - To be Filed Separately, #7 Exhibit 007 - Letter dated 03/13/22 Regarding Meloxicam, #8 Exhibit 008 - Health Service Requests, #9 Exhibit 009 - Health Service Requests, #10 Exhibit 010 - Letters from Health Service Unit Dated 02/18/22 and 03/03/2022 and Interview/Information Request, #11 Exhibit 011 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 03/10/22, #12 Exhibit 012 - Letter Sent to Warden Fuchs on 03/03/22 (Very Faint), #13 Exhibit 013 - Letter from Health Service Nursing Coordinator Rachel Snow Dated 03/30/22 and Interview/Information Request, #14 Exhibit 014 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 02/19/22, #15 Exhibit 015 - Off-Site Service Request and Reports and Prescription Order, #16 Exhibit 016 - Off-Site Service Request and Report and Ascension Mercy Hospital Radiology Report, #17 Exhibit 017 - Letter from Dr. Ribault dated 09/21/20, #18 Exhibit 018 - Letter to Dr. Ribault Dated 11/15/20, #19 Exhibit 019 - Health Service Requests) (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief in Support of #4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiffs Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiffs Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sworn Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CCI Prison Facility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gesina S. Carson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin L Grzebielski