This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:03:56 (UTC).

Goodspeed v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Goodspeed filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01569

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Goodspeed

Defendant

Standard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Leila Louzri

Attorney at Foster Law Firm

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorneys

James T Hedgepath

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Gville)

Po Box 10648

Greenville, SC 29603

Michael T Brittingham

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet Jacobs and Pollard

Po Drawer 2426

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

DOI Letter

#6

6 #1

Supporting Documents

#7

#8

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Stipulation Deadline 11/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/20/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Standard Insurance Company.(Hedgepath, James) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Hedgepath, James) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Standard Insurance Company answer due 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Hedgepath, James) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Goodspeed. Standard Insurance Company served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (alew, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michelle Goodspeed.(alew, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9870501.), filed by Michelle Goodspeed. Service due by 8/25/2021(alew, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T Brittingham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James T Hedgepath