This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 10:20:54 (UTC).

Goodrich v. QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Goodrich filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against QuEST Global Services-N A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James T Moody and Andrew P Rodovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James T Moody

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Goodrich

Defendant

QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason R Ramsland

Attorney at Ramsland Law

8520 Allison Pointe Blvd Ste 223 Pmb 65298

Indianapolis, IN 46250

Defendant Attorneys

Eric S Clark

Attorney at Thompson Hine LLP - Cin/OH

312 Walnut St Ste 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4089

Anthony P McNamara

Attorney at Thompson Hine LLP - Cin/OH

312 Walnut St Ste 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4089

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit - A - Answer of Defendant Quest Global Services-N.A., Inc.

#7

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - 2020-10-15 Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - 2020-10-15 Complaint and Jury Demand

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/29/2021, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Jason Ramsland. Dft appeared by attys Anthony McNamara, Eric Clark. The Report filed as DE #12 is APPROVED and ADOPTED through the end of discovery as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/5/2021. Discovery to be completed by 8/6/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 5/7/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 6/21/2021. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 7/21/2021. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltf is 2/5/2021; for Dft is 2/26/2021. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (tc) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P McNamara on behalf of QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc. (McNamara, Anthony) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge James T Moody for all further proceedings. Judge Philip P Simon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 1/25/21. (ksc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clark, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2021 10:30 AM (Central time) in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Rodovich's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/14/2021. (tc) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc..(Clark, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Court GRANTS #7 Motion for Leave to Re-File Answer Instanter. Defendant DIRECTED to file their answer, attached as Exhibit A to the instant motion, upon receipt of this order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/5/2021. Text entry only. (tc) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Answer to Complaint by Defendant QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A - Answer of Defendant Quest Global Services-N.A., Inc., #2 Proposed Order)(Clark, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER STRIKING #5 Answer to Complaint filed by QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc. Responsive pleadings must restate verbatim the paragraphs from the pleading they respond to and must, immediately following each restated paragraph, state the response to that paragraph. N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/4/2021. (lhc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *STRICKEN pursuant to #6 * ANSWER to Complaint by QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc. (Clark, Eric) Modified on 1/4/2021 to strike (lhc). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/30/2020. (tc) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketJudge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc.. (Clark, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4436121.) from Tippecanoe County, Indiana Circuit Court, Cause No. 79C01-2010-PL-000133, filed by QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - 2020-10-15 Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - 2020-10-15 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QuEST Global Services-N.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason R Ramsland