This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2021 at 07:17:54 (UTC).

GOODNOW v. 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 GOODNOW filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L HINKLE and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LLOYD J. GOODNOW

Morriston, FL 32668

Defendant

3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SARAH E CLOUSE

Attorney at US HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

TODD BARRY TATELMAN

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LLOYD J. GOODNOW. (atm) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/25/2020).), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by TODD BARRY TATELMAN on behalf of 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (TATELMAN, TODD) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH E CLOUSE on behalf of 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA from Eighth Judicial Circuit, Levy County, FL, case number 2020000282SCAXXX., filed by 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LLOYD J. GOODNOW. (atm) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/25/2020).), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (bkp) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by TODD BARRY TATELMAN on behalf of 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (TATELMAN, TODD) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH E CLOUSE on behalf of 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA from Eighth Judicial Circuit, Levy County, FL, case number 2020000282SCAXXX., filed by 3RD CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (CLOUSE, SARAH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Edith Clouse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Barry Tatelman Esq.