This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 12:17:34 (UTC).

Goodman v. Boeckmann et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Goodman filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Boeckmann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Godbey and Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David C Godbey

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Defendants

Matthew McSorley

Alan M Bennett

Matthew K Rose

Armando J Olivera

Rosemary T Berkery

D Michael Steuert

Deborah D McWhinney

Carlos M Hernandez

Nader H Sultan

Thomas C Leppert

David E Constable

Bruce A Stanski

Biggs C Porter

Robin K Chopra

Peter K Barker

Peter J Fluor

Steven Gittins

David T Seaton

Lynn C Swann

Samuel J Locklear, III

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L Raiff

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

2001 Ross Ave., Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201-2923

Lissa Percopo

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

Theodore Carl Anderson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

Scott R Jacobsen

Attorney at Scott Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floort

New York, NY 10169

Geoffrey M Johnson

Attorney at Scott+Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

12434 Cedar Road, Suite 12

Cleveland Heights, OH 44106

Scott Richard Jacobsen

Attorney at Scott Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#12

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Joint Stipulation

#11

#8

#9

7 #2

Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lissa M. Percopo. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 4/18/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 04/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Setting Briefing Schedule Regarding Lead Motions by Joan Goodman. (Jacobsen, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER AND STAY: It is hereby ordered that this action is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Brantley Starr and shall henceforth carry the suffix let "X". Case reassigned to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case.Plaintiff shall file any motion to consolidate the Derivative Action with the Related Derivative Actions, to appoint Plaintiff as Lead Plaintiff, Plaintiff's counsel as Lead Counsel, and to appoint Liaison Counsel, along with any supporting documents, in the Derivative Action and Related Derivative Actions, by 4/16/2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/18/2021) (ykp) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11707502) filed by Peter K Barker, Alan M Bennett, Rosemary T Berkery, Alan Boeckmann, Robin K Chopra, David E Constable, Peter J Fluor, Fluor Corporation, James T Hackett, Carlos M Hernandez, Thomas C Leppert, Samuel J Locklear, III, Matthew McSorley, Deborah D McWhinney, Armando J Olivera, Biggs C Porter, Joseph W Prueher, Matthew K Rose, David T Seaton, Gary G Smalley, Bruce A Stanski, D Michael Steuert, Nader H Sultan, Lynn C Swann (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Peter K Barker(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Alan M Bennett(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Rosemary T Berkery(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Alan Boeckmann(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Robin K Chopra(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party David E Constable(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Peter J Fluor(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Fluor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party James T Hackett(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Carlos M Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Thomas C Leppert(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Samuel J Locklear, III(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Matthew McSorley(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Deborah D McWhinney(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Armando J Olivera(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Biggs C Porter(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Joseph W Prueher(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Matthew K Rose(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party David T Seaton(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Gary G Smalley(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Bruce A Stanski(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party D Michael Steuert(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Nader H Sultan(pty:dft), Attorney Lissa Percopo added to party Lynn C Swann(pty:dft) (Percopo, Lissa) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Transfer and Stay Case filed by Joan Goodman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Jacobsen, Scott). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott R. Jacobsen. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/8/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REDACTED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Peter K Barker, Alan M Bennett, Rosemary T Berkery, Alan Boeckmann, Robin K Chopra, David E Constable, Peter J Fluor, Fluor Corporation, Steven Gittins, James T Hackett, Carlos M Hernandez, Thomas C Leppert, Samuel J Locklear, III, Matthew McSorley, Deborah D McWhinney, Armando J Olivera, Biggs C Porter, Joseph W Prueher, Matthew K Rose, David T Seaton, Gary G Smalley, Bruce A Stanski, D Michael Steuert filed by Joan Goodman. (Anderson, Theodore) Modified text and linkage on 3/8/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fluor Corporation; served on 2/25/2021. (jmg) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11661446) filed by Joan Goodman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Jacobsen, Scott) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (Document Restricted) Sealed ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiff's sealed motion to seal complaint #4 : Plaintiff's Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint and attached exhibits are to be filed under seal pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79.3(b). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/26/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Peter K Barker, Alan M Bennett, Rosemary T Berkery, Alan Boeckmann, Robin K Chopra, David E Constable, Peter J Fluor, Fluor Corporation, Steven Gittins, James T Hackett, Carlos M Hernandez, Thomas C Leppert, Samuel J Locklear, III, Matthew McSorley, Deborah D McWhinney, Armando J Olivera, Biggs C Porter, Joseph W Prueher, Matthew K Rose, David T Seaton, Gary G Smalley, Bruce A Stanski, D Michael Steuert, Nader H Sultan, Lynn C Swann. (ndt) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79.3(b). filed by Joan Goodman (ndt) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joan Goodman. (mjr) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Peter K Barker, Alan M Bennett, Rosemary T Berkery, Alan Boeckmann, Robin K Chopra, David E Constable, Peter J Fluor, Fluor Corporation, Steven Gittins, James T Hackett, Carlos M Hernandez, Thomas C Leppert, Samuel J Locklear, III, Matthew McSorley, Deborah D McWhinney, Armando J Olivera, Biggs C Porter, Joseph W Prueher, Matthew K Rose, David T Seaton, Gary G Smalley, Bruce A Stanski, D Michael Steuert filed by Joan Goodman. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS129585) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-1, #2 Exhibit(s) A-5, #3 Exhibit(s) A-6, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Cover Sheet) (mjr) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore Carl Anderson, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey M. Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R. Jacobsen