This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:41:33 (UTC).

Goodman Management LLC v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Goodman Management LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00243

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Goodman Management LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI & BENDESKY P.C.

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MARNI BERGER

Attorney at Saltz Mongeluzzi & Bendesky P.C.

1650 Market St. Fl 52, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

TIMOTHY A. CARROLL

Attorney at CLYDE & CO US LLP

340 Mt. Kemble Ave., Ste 300

Morristown, NJ 07960

JARED K. CLAPPER

Attorney at CLYDE & CO US LLP

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60603

PATRICK F. HOFER

Attorney at CLYDE & CO US LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20006

LOUIS A. BOVE

Attorney at BODELL BOVE LLC.

1845 Walnut St Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim OF DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY by Goodman Management LLC.(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

19 #3

Exhibit C

19 #2

Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit A

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MARNI BERGER on behalf of Goodman Management LLC with Certificate of Service(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. a Delaware corporation; Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation; Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation. by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(CARROLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #6

Designation Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Court Documents Served on Zurich

1 #3

Exhibit C - 2020 Policy

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2019 Policy

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to File filed by Goodman Management LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim OF DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY by Goodman Management LLC.(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Goodman Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HOFER, PATRICK) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXENTSION OF TIME AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/2/22. 3/2/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JARED K. CLAPPER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/28/22. 2/28/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jared K. Clapper by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15750792.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4(b) by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BOVE, LOUIS) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDERED THAT PATRICK F. HOFER, ESQUIRE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/25/22. 2/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick F. Hofer by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15747654.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Goodman Management LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Goodman Management LLC by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. Affirmative Defenses.(CARROLL, TIMOTHY) Modified on 2/14/2022 (tjd). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#8) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (tomg) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/26/22. 1/26/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4(b) by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BOVE, LOUIS) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS A. BOVE on behalf of ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BOVE, LOUIS) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by Goodman Management LLC.(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MARNI BERGER on behalf of Goodman Management LLC with Certificate of Service(BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. a Delaware corporation; Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation; Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation. by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(CARROLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15672620), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2019 Policy, #3 Exhibit C - 2020 Policy, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Documents Served on Zurich, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form)(CARROLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared Kent Clapper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy A Carroll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUIS A. BOVE