This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2020 at 08:03:08 (UTC).

Goodman et al v. Schlumberger Tech. Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Goodman filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Schlumberger Tech Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00785

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brad Hill

Wesley Goodman

Nathan Rogers

James Taylor

Defendant

Schlumberger Tech. Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William Richard Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Robert P Lombardi

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras St, Ste 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Samuel Zurik, III

Attorney at Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras St, 1600 Energy Centre

New Orleans, LA 70163

Bryan Edward Bowdler

Attorney at The Kullman Firm PLC

1100 Poydras St, Ste 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed.(Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Bryan Edward Bowdler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Robert Peter Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Bryan Edward Bowdler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2020. (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

11 #1

Attachment

#11

(#11) MOTION for Robert P. Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed.(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#9

(#9) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Schlumberger Tech. Corp. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020, filed.(Liles, William) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Wesley Goodman, Brad Hill, Nathan Rogers, James Taylor, filed. (Liles, William) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Wesley Goodman, Brad Hill, Nathan Rogers, James Taylor, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Schlumberger Tech. Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24329437) filed by James Taylor, Wesley Goodman, Nathan Rogers, Brad Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed.(Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Bryan Edward Bowdler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Robert Peter Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Bryan Edward Bowdler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2020. (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Robert P. Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed.(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Schlumberger Tech. Corp. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020, filed.(Liles, William) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Wesley Goodman, Brad Hill, Nathan Rogers, James Taylor, filed. (Liles, William) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Wesley Goodman, Brad Hill, Nathan Rogers, James Taylor, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Schlumberger Tech. Corp.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Schlumberger Tech. Corp., filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Schlumberger Tech. Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24329437) filed by James Taylor, Wesley Goodman, Nathan Rogers, Brad Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E. Bowdler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Zurik, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Lombardi