This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 08:21:57 (UTC).

Goode v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Goode filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Gaughan and Jonathan D. Greenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02240

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia A. Gaughan

Referral Judge

Jonathan D. Greenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monte Goode

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine M. Braun

Attorney at Kordic & Braun

820 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration - Chicago

Cara Staley Rafferty

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for further proceedings. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/12/20. (LC,S) re #9 (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/21/2020. (S,S) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,Br) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. Related document(s) #10 . (Y,A) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for further proceedings. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/12/20. (LC,S) re #9 (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Social Security Administration. (Staley Rafferty, Cara) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service through the U.S. Attorney executed upon Social Security Administration on 10/26/2020; the U.S. Attorney General (signed c-19) and the Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 10/28/20 by FedEx, filed on behalf of Monte Goode. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Br) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal on 10/21/2020 for service upon Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (S,S) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/21/2020. (S,S) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/21/2020. (S,S) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/5/2020. (L,Br) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,Br) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,Br) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJudge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,Br) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Compliance filed by Monte Goode. (Braun, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Monte Goode. (Braun, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Monte Goode. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less