This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:23:33 (UTC).

Good Deed Productions, Inc. v. Cinedigm Entertainment Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Good Deed Productions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cinedigm Entertainment Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip S. Gutierrez and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03236

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment

Good Deed Productions, Inc.

Good Deed Productions, Inc. doing business as Good Deed Entertainment, a California Corporation

Defendants

Cinedigm Entertainment Corporation

DOES 1-25, inclusive,

Chris McGurk

Gary Loffredo

Does 1-25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven T Lowe

Attorney at Lowe and Associates APC

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1038

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Aleksandra M Hilvert

Attorney at Lowe and Associates PC

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1038

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aleksandra M Hilvert counsel for Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc.. Adding Aleksandra Hilvert as counsel of record for Good Deed Productions Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Aleksandra M Hilvert added to party Good Deed Productions, Inc. (pty:pla))(Hilvert, Aleksandra) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc., (Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Cinedigm Entertainment Corporation, Gary Loffredo, Chris McGurk. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment. (Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment. (Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-26002547 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Steven T Lowe added to party Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment(pty:pla))(Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aleksandra M Hilvert counsel for Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc.. Adding Aleksandra Hilvert as counsel of record for Good Deed Productions Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Aleksandra M Hilvert added to party Good Deed Productions, Inc. (pty:pla))(Hilvert, Aleksandra) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc., (Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Cinedigm Entertainment Corporation, Gary Loffredo, Chris McGurk. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment. (Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment. (Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-26002547 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Steven T Lowe added to party Good Deed Productions, Inc. dba Good Deed Entertainment(pty:pla))(Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cinedigm Entertainment Corp., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven T Lowe