This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:58:54 (UTC).

Gooba, Inc. v. Homemade Projects, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Gooba, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Homemade Projects, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08043

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gooba, Inc.

Defendant

Homemade Projects, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Homemade Merch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Max J. Sprecher

Attorney at Law Offices of Max J Sprecher

5850 Canoga Avenue 4Th Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Robert S. Meloni

Attorney at Meloni and McCaffrey PC

3 Columbus Circle, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Peter J. Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gooba, Inc., upon Defendant Homemade Projects, LLC served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sharon Sindilarn, office manager for agent for service (Tyson Beem) in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Meloni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gooba, Inc, designating Max J. Sprecher as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08043 JFW(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08043 CAS(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

NY Certificate of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert S Meloni on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Homemade Projects, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#4

#3

#2

#1

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #15 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and hereby is extended to December 27, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#19) DECLARATION of Peter Anderson as Lead Trial Counsel, filed by Defendant Homemade Projects, LLC. (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Gooba, Inc. to Order to Show Cause, #16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Max Sprecher in support of response to OSC)(Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#17) DECLARATION of Robert S. Meloni in compliance with paragraph 3(a) of the Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Gooba, Inc.. (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#16) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by November 17, 2021 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. No oral argument on this matter will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (iv) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Homemade Projects, LLC answer now due 12/27/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Homemade Projects, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Homemade Projects, LLC(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gooba, Inc., upon Defendant Homemade Projects, LLC served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sharon Sindilarn, office manager for agent for service (Tyson Beem) in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Meloni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gooba, Inc, designating Max J. Sprecher as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08043 JFW(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08043 CAS(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S Meloni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Gooba, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32136335) filed by plaintiff Gooba, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert S Meloni on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Homemade Projects, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Gooba, Inc., identifying Daniel Hernandez pka Tekashi69 and Tekashi 6ix9ine. (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gooba, Inc.. (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Gooba, Inc.. (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-32125062 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Gooba, Inc.. (Attorney Max J. Sprecher added to party Gooba, Inc. (pty:pla))(Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J Anderson