This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2021 at 09:22:49 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Wal-Mart Stores of Texas LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores of Texas LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01531

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flor Arellano Gonzalez

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores of Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart Supercenter

Wal-Mart Stores of Texas LLC doing business as Walmart Supercenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian H Crockett

Attorney at Crockett Law PC

9900 Westpark, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77063

Maxwell T Paderewski

9900 Westpark Dr, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77063

Defendant Attorneys

Bevan A Rhine

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) 60-DAY DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court has been advised that the parties in the captioned matter have reached a settlement agreement. [Doc. No. #5 ]. Therefore, after sixty (60) days have elapsed from the issuance of this order, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims by all parties subject to the parties' right to reopen the litigation within those 60 days if the settlement is not consummated. Upon dismissal of this case, each party will bear its own attorney fees and costs. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/23/2021) (ndt) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Wal-Mart Stores of Texas LLC (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING LOCAL COUNSEL, ATTORNEY CONFERENCE, AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2021. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/9/2021) (ndt) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores of Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D discl stmt

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C state pldgs

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B state docket

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores of Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12020933) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan) (Attachment 5 replaced/flattened on 7/2/2021) (mjr). (Entered: 07/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Aug 23 14:49:07 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60-DAY DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court has been advised that the parties in the captioned matter have reached a settlement agreement. [Doc. No. #5 ]. Therefore, after sixty (60) days have elapsed from the issuance of this order, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims by all parties subject to the parties' right to reopen the litigation within those 60 days if the settlement is not consummated. Upon dismissal of this case, each party will bear its own attorney fees and costs. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/23/2021) (ndt) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Wal-Mart Stores of Texas LLC (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Jul 9 14:20:37 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING LOCAL COUNSEL, ATTORNEY CONFERENCE, AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2021. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/9/2021) (ndt) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Fri Jul 2 08:54:25 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores of Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores of Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12020933) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan) (Attachment 5 replaced/flattened on 7/2/2021) (mjr). (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant