This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 09:24:21 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Gonzalez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-22028

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesus Gonzalez

Defendants

The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc. doing business as The Cheesecake Factory #214 at Ponce de Leon Boulevard,

The Cheesecake Factory #214 At Ponce De Leon Boulevard,

BALBRO 25-26, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Courtney Cunningham

8950 Sw 74Th Court, Suite 2201

Miami, FL 33156

Defendant Attorney

Robert Stephen Galbo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

333 S.E. 2Nd Avenue, Suite 4400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BALBRO 25-26, LLC, The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.. (swr) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc. shall file its response to the Complaint no later than September 6, 2022. Response/Answer due 9/6/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galbo, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint no later than August 22, 2022. Response/Answer due 8/22/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.. Attorney Robert Stephen Galbo added to party The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galbo, Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc. served on 7/11/2022, response/answer due 8/1/2022. (Cunningham, Juan) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report REGARDING FILINGS FOR THE SAME OR SIMILAR VIOLATIONS OF THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Juan Courtney Cunningham on behalf of Jesus Gonzalez (Cunningham, Juan) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULINGREPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BALBRO 25-26, LLC, The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.. (swr) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BALBRO 25-26, LLC, The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15765532, filed by Jesus Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Stephen Galbo