This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 08:00:09 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Target Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Joe Fish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02666

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cristina Gonzalez

Defendants

Target Corporation

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sadat Montgomery

Attorney at Montgomery Law PLLC

2777 N Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1525

Dallas, TX 75207

Anwar Sadat Montgomery

Attorney at Montgomery Law PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 11400

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Donna C Peavler

Attorney at The Peavler Group

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Sara Kimbrough Scudday

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Person. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/3/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristina Gonzalez. (Montgomery, Anwar) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#7

(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Cristina Gonzalez with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Montgomery, Anwar) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/3/2019) (twd) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/12/2019) (epm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Within 15 days of the date of this order, counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership* or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/12/2019) (epm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Target Corporation. (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st Judicial District Court, case number DC-19-14211 filed by Target Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10394326) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Person. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/3/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristina Gonzalez. (Montgomery, Anwar) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Cristina Gonzalez with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Montgomery, Anwar) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/3/2019) (twd) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Nov 13 10:30:19 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Nov 13 10:28:24 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/12/2019) (epm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Within 15 days of the date of this order, counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership* or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/12/2019) (epm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Target Corporation. (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st Judicial District Court, case number DC-19-14211 filed by Target Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10394326) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anwar Sadat Montgomery