Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:56 (UTC).

GONZALEZ v. PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Steven C. Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17062

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Steven C. Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER GONZALEZ

Defendants

PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BHARAT DESAI

BHAVESH PATEL

MAHESH PATEL

BURGER KING

PARADE ENTERPRISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW I. GLENN

Attorney at JAFFE GLENN LAW GROUP PA

301 N Harrison St, Ste 9F, #306

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant Attorney

TRACY A. ARMSTRONG

Attorney at WILENTZ, GOLDMAN & SPITZER

90 Woodbridge Center Drive, Box 10

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting Defendants a two week extension to file an Answer in this matter. A Rule 16 conference will be held on 12/16/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Room 2B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/8/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Letter from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#8

(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to All Defendants.. (ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

6 #1

Affidavit of Service

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. BHAVESH PATEL served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

5 #1

Affidavit of Service

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. MAHESH PATEL served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

4 #1

Affidavit of Service

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join

#2

(#2) NOTICE by JENNIFER GONZALEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting Defendants a two week extension to file an Answer in this matter. A Rule 16 conference will be held on 12/16/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Room 2B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/8/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to File Response submitted by MAHESH PATEL, BHAVESH PATEL, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHARAT DESAI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/2/2019. (Ti) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to All Defendants.. (ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER: A status conference to be held on 11/6/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Steve Mannion in courtroom 2B. The Court will concurrently hold conferences in the cases docketed 18cv8890; 19-0223; 19-17060 and 19-17062. Lead trial counsel must appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/16/19. (Mannion, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. BHAVESH PATEL served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. MAHESH PATEL served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by JENNIFER GONZALEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912328) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JENNIFER GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW I. GLENN