This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 08:09:07 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Kolitwenzew et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Gonzalez filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Kolitwenzew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Bramlette, III and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Luis H Gonzalez

Washington, MS 39190

Carlos Ramos Sanchez

Washington, MS 39190

Respondents

Ron Vitiello

Jose L. Zamora

Chad Kolitwenzew

Kevin McAleenan

William Barr

Shawn R. Gillis

Interested Parties

Edward O. Pearson United States of America

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Greggory R Walters

Attorney at US ATTY

One Technology Plaza, Suite 400, 211 Fulton St

Peoria, IL 61602

Nancy Ann Nicholson

Attorney at KANKAKEE COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY

6Th Floor, 189 E Court Street

Kankakee, IL 60901

Interested Party Attorneys

Hilary W. Frooman-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY

318 South Sixth Street

Springfield, IL 62701-1806

Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

Marc A. Perez-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Luis H. Gonzalez; (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked). (smm, ) Modified on 7/22/2019 to change to Petition (VH, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Petitioner Luis H. Gonzalez for attorney representation. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Luis H. Gonzalez in support of request to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) MAILED Acknowledgment Letter regarding new case information to Carlos Ramos Sanchez. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Carlos Ramos Shanchez dated 5/18/19. (Envelope postmarked 5/22/19)(ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#7

(#7) LETTER from Carlos Ramos Sanchez dated 5/28/2019 (Envelope postmarked 5/30/2019). (las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

(#8) RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus under U.S.C. 2241 filed by Carlos Ramos Sanchez against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Ron Vitiello, Jose L. Zamora. (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Petitioner Carlos Ramos Sanchez for attorney representation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#38

(#38) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chad Kolitwenzew (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Filing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order to Withdraw).(PG) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#42

(#42) ORDER granting #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; directing Shawn R. Gillis to file supplemental response on or before 1/8/20. Attorney Nancy Ann Nicholson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 11, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#40

(#40) ORDER directing Petitioner to respond with the name and address of his custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 22, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#41

(#41) Response to Order re #40 ORDER directing Petitioner to respond with the name and address of his custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 22, 2019. (MMc) filed by Luis H Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Envelope From Hattiesburg, MS, #2 Envelope From Plaintiff)(PG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#39

RESTRICTED

#34

(#34) ORDER directing Petitioner to respond with the name and address of his custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 31, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#37

RESTRICTED

#35

RESTRICTED

#36

(#36) Letter from Luis Gonzalez. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/5/2019) (PG). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER granting #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; directing Shawn R. Gillis to file supplemental response on or before 1/8/20. Attorney Nancy Ann Nicholson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 11, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Response to Order re #40 ORDER directing Petitioner to respond with the name and address of his custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 22, 2019. (MMc) filed by Luis H Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Envelope From Hattiesburg, MS, #2 Envelope From Plaintiff)(PG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER directing Petitioner to respond with the name and address of his custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 22, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chad Kolitwenzew (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Filing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order to Withdraw).(PG) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Mail Returned as Return to Sender as to #34 Order. Mail sent to Luis Gonzalez. (PG) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Perez-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Letter from Luis Gonzalez. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/5/2019) (PG). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER directing Petitioner to respond with the name and address of his custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 31, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Letter sent to Nancy Ann Nicholson, Esq. on 10/18/2019 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PG) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Order, this case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Urbana, Illinois, for preliminary consideration. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the notice of motion for Docket Entry 3 in CM/ECF and close this case number on this Court's docket.Mailed notice(slb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Petitioner Carlos Ramos Sanchez for attorney representation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus under U.S.C. 2241 filed by Carlos Ramos Sanchez against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Ron Vitiello, Jose L. Zamora. (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER from Carlos Ramos Sanchez dated 5/28/2019 (Envelope postmarked 5/30/2019). (las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from Carlos Ramos Shanchez dated 5/18/19. (Envelope postmarked 5/22/19)(ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED Acknowledgment Letter regarding new case information to Carlos Ramos Sanchez. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Luis H. Gonzalez in support of request to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION by Petitioner Luis H. Gonzalez for attorney representation. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Luis H. Gonzalez; (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked). (smm, ) Modified on 7/22/2019 to change to Petition (VH, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.