This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2021 at 09:00:52 (UTC).

Iliana Gonzalez v. Johnson and Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Iliana Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson and Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10820

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iliana Gonzalez

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.

Does 1 through 100 Inclusive

Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Johnson and Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terry Michael Fehmel

Attorney at Fehmel and Associates

4550 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Shanen Reid Prout

Attorney at Shanen Prout Law Offices

11400 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Mollie Fleming Benedict

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Monee Takla Hanna

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 6/21/2021. Motion hearing cut-off 6/28/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 5, 2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Court's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for February 1, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #14 / Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc..(Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc... (Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Iliana Gonzalez, identifying Iliana Gonzalez. (Prout, Shanen) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. amending Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Iliana Gonzalez(Attorney Shanen Reid Prout added to party Iliana Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Prout, Shanen) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Notice of Waiver of Procedural Defect filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. (Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because this case was not originally removable under 1446(b)(1), the one year limitation on removal applies to this case. Accordingly, Removing Defendant's Notice of Removal is not timely under 1446(c)(1). The Court therefore concludes that the Notice of Removal is procedurally defective. See 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(1). Accordingly, this action is remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19STCV34848. The Court stays this order until December 17, 2020. If Plaintiff wishes to waive the procedural defect and, as a result, remain in federal court, she must file a Notice of Waiver of Procedural Defect no later than December 17, 2020. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge (For use in Direct Assignment of Civil Cases to Magistrate Judges Program Only) filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. DOES NOT CONSENT to proceed before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 . (Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. answer now due 1/6/2021, re Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc..(Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. [See document for details.] (san) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Johnson and Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Iliana Gonzalez(lh) (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/27/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Johnson and Johnson. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Iliana Gonzalez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/01/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on November 30, 2020. (Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., (Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. (Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV34848 Receipt No: ACACDC-29257973 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mollie F. Benedict, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanen Reid Prout