This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2021 at 10:26:50 (UTC).

Veronica R. Gonzalez v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Veronica R Gonzalez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and John E. McDermott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06764

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERONICA R. GONZALEZ

Defendants and Counter Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc. doing business as Caruso Ford

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc. doing business as Caruso Ford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjeman R Beck

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts PC

5757 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Matt Xie

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts PC

5757 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Nancy Zhang

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts PC

5757 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Joy Hughes

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel A Law

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Judd A Gilefsky

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Craig Alan Roeb

Attorney at Chapman Glucksman Dean and Roeb

11900 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Craig Alan Roeb

Attorney at Chapman Glucksman Dean and Roeb

11900 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

#43

#42

41 #1

Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Plaintiff's Motion

41 #41

Main Document

#40

34 #2

Declaration Declaration of White J. Xie in Support of Plaintiff's Motion fo

34 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's M

34 #34

Main Document

#18

5 #1

Exhibit

5 #5

Main Document

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case Number: 20STCV26518. (et) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TOREMAND TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT [filed 9/20/2021; Docket No. #34 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Los Angeles County Superior Court is GRANTED. This action is hereby REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court. [MD JS-6. Case Terminated.] (et) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Los Angeles Superior Court)(Xie, Matt) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #34 filed by Plaintiff Veronica R. Gonzalez. (Xie, Matt) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) COUNTERCLAIM against FORD MOTOR COMPANY Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition #18 , filed by Defendant/Counter-Claimant Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc.(Roeb, Craig) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #18 filed by LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. dba CARUSO FORD Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc..(Attorney Craig Alan Roeb added to party Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roeb, Craig) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Remand To State Court re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #34 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Law, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Veronica R. Gonzalez, upon Defendant Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mai Houa Yang, Client Representative for Cogency Global, Inc. (registered agent for service of process for Defendant Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc. DBA Caruso Ford) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Xie, Matt) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Remand to Los Angeles County Superior Court)(Xie, Matt) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Veronica R. Gonzalez. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Los Angeles County Superior Court, #2 Declaration Declaration of White J. Xie in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand to Los Angeles County Superior Court) (Xie, Matt) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Veronica R. Gonzalez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, re Declaration #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice (Other) #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on August 20, 2021. (Hughes, Samantha) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hughes, Samantha) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Hughes, Samantha) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of SAMANTHA J. HUGHES re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Hughes, Samantha) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Hughes, Samantha) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California in the County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV36096 Receipt No: ACACDC-31848007 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Samantha Joy Hughes added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Hughes, Samantha) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Alan Roeb