This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 07:25:34 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Biomet Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Gonzalez

Defendants

Biomet Manufacturing Corp

Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC

Biomet Inc.

Biomet Orthopedics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J Cross PHV

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe

8235 Forsyth Blvd Ste 1100

Clayton, MO 63105

Jeffrey J Lowe PHV

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe

8235 Forsyth Blvd Ste 1100

Clayton, MO 63105

Don Springmeyer

Attorney at Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman and Rabkin, LLP

3556 E Russell Rd, Second Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89120-2234

Defendant Attorneys

John D LaDue

Attorney at LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

100 E Wayne St Ste 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Erin Linder Hanig

Attorney at LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

100 E Wayne St Ste 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Theodore E O'Reilly

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jennifer W. Arledge

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

300 South Fourth Street, 11Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Tarifa Belle Laddon

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Stephanie N Russo

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Adrienne Franco Busby

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Andrew L Campbell

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

J Joseph Tanner

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

 

Court Documents

#192

(#192) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #87 Plaintiff's First Request for the Production of Documents to Defendants is TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#191

(#191) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Biomet Inc., Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#190

(#190) ORDER Granting #188 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tarifa B. Laddon for Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer W. Arledge. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#189

(#189) ORDER Granting #187 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Theodore E. O'Reilly for defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer W. Arledge. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#188

(#188) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tarifa B. Laddon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer Willis Arledge (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5410708) by Defendants Biomet Inc., Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. (Arledge, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

87 #3

Exhibit Defendant's Response to First Interrogatories

87 #2

Exhibit Defendant's Response to First Requests for Production

87 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's First Interrogatories

#87

(#192) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #87 Plaintiff's First Request for the Production of Documents to Defendants is TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER : At the request of the parties, the telephonic status conference on Tuesday, December 23, 2014 will commence at 11:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. ***NOTE: ONLY THE TIME HAS CHANGED***. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/16/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/09/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John David LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/09/2014)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Veronica Gonzalez. All Defendants. (Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2014)

#2

(#2) ORDER: GRANTING (2789) Motion to Extend Master Settlement Agreement Mediation Resolution Deadline in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. The mediation deadline is extended from 12/5/14 to 1/30/2015. Any mediated case not resolved by 1/30/15, subject to the aggregate settlement percentage requirements will be remanded pursuant to an appropriate order of the court. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/18/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

1 #3

Waiver of Service of Summons

1 #2

Request for Waiver of Service of Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2500458.), filed by Veronica Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2014)

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#192) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #87 Plaintiff's First Request for the Production of Documents to Defendants is TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#191) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Biomet Inc., Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#190) ORDER Granting #188 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tarifa B. Laddon for Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer W. Arledge. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#189) ORDER Granting #187 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Theodore E. O'Reilly for defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer W. Arledge. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#188) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tarifa B. Laddon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer Willis Arledge (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5410708) by Defendants Biomet Inc., Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. (Arledge, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#187) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Theodore E. O'Reilly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer Willis Arledge (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5410669) by Defendants Biomet Inc., Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. (Arledge, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#186) ORDER Granting #184 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew J Cross and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/29/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#185) ORDER Granting #183 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey J Lowe and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/29/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#184) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Cross and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5407709) by Plaintiff Veronica Gonzalez. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#183) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Lowe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5407685) by Plaintiff Veronica Gonzalez. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
186 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2014
  • (#9) STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/23/2014 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty R. Dassow, T. Anapol (by phone), M. Lanier (by phone). Dfts appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Winter (by phone). Joint Status Report due 1/22/15; Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/30/2015 at 11:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written Memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 12/24/2014 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REAPPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' ORGANIZATIONAL STRUCTURE: Order appointing/reappointing Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Executive Committee, Lead, and Liaison Counsel effective Jan 1, 2015-Dec 31, 2015.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/22/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE : Call in information for December 23, 2014 telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/16/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER : At the request of the parties, the telephonic status conference on Tuesday, December 23, 2014 will commence at 11:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. ***NOTE: ONLY THE TIME HAS CHANGED***. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John David LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Veronica Gonzalez. All Defendants. (Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: GRANTING (2789) Motion to Extend Master Settlement Agreement Mediation Resolution Deadline in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. The mediation deadline is extended from 12/5/14 to 1/30/2015. Any mediated case not resolved by 1/30/15, subject to the aggregate settlement percentage requirements will be remanded pursuant to an appropriate order of the court. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/18/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2500458.), filed by Veronica Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIOMET MANUFACTURING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BIOMET U S RECONSTRUCTION LLC is a litigant