This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 11:16:50 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Bartlett et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Gonzalez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bartlett. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-00443

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Everton Gonzalez

Defendants

Sgt. William Foose

C.O. Adam Snyder

C.O. Joshua Bartlett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Sivin

Attorney at Sivin, Miller & Roche LLP

20 Vesey Street, Suite 1400

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on C.O. Adam Snyder on April 26, 2021, filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sgt. William Foose on April 26, 2021, filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on C.O. Joshua Bartlett on April 26, 2021, filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 2:30 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/14/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Joshua Bartlett, William Foose, Adam Snyder. (meb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Joshua Bartlett, William Foose, Adam Snyder (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5498750) filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on C.O. Adam Snyder on April 26, 2021, filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sgt. William Foose on April 26, 2021, filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on C.O. Joshua Bartlett on April 26, 2021, filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 2:30 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/14/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Joshua Bartlett, William Foose, Adam Snyder. (meb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Joshua Bartlett, William Foose, Adam Snyder (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5498750) filed by Everton Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Sivin Esq.