This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2023 at 20:58:06 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Barrett Business Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Gonzalez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Barrett Business Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Daniel E. Butcher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01810

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Antonio Gonzalez

Defendants

Barrett Business Services Inc.

Techsico, Inc.

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jihad M. Smaili

Stephen D. Counts

Defendant Attorneys

David Ian Dalby

Ann H. Qushair

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-C

1 #3

Notice to Adverse Party

1 #4

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Techsico, Inc. (cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Techsico, Inc.. No Parties With Financial Interest. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1). (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Techsico, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1). (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Barrett Business Services Inc..(Whittemore, Brian)Attorney Brian S. Whittemore added to party Barrett Business Services Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/22/2022.(anh) Modified on 11/22/2022 (anh). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Ian Dalby on behalf of Barrett Business Services Inc. (Dalby, David)Attorney David Ian Dalby added to party Barrett Business Services Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance and Withdrawal by Ann H. Qushair on behalf of Techsico, Inc. (Qushair, Ann)Attorney Ann H. Qushair added to party Techsico, Inc.(pty:dft)(ave). (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Continue January 5, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference by Techsico, Inc.. (Qushair, Ann) (anh). (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action by Juan Antonio Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice)(Smaili, Jihad)(anh). (Entered: 03/31/2023)

17 #1

Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudi

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. Rule 41 [Doc. No. #17 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/3/2023. (anh) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action by Juan Antonio Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice)(Smaili, Jihad)(anh). (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on March 7, 2023. A settlement was reached in this case with respect to all claims and parties and the terms were recited on the record. The attorneys must appear for a telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") on May 19, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. unless a joint motion for dismissal is filed with the Court, and a separate proposed order for dismissal is e-mailed to the district judge's e-mail address, prior to the SDC. Plaintiff's counsel must initiate the Conference and call the Court's Chambers with all counsel on the line. The SDC will be vacated if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers beforehand.(Plaintiff Attorney Jihad Smaili). (Defendant Barrett Business Attorney David Dalby). (Defendant Techsico Attorneys John Haubrich and Ann Quishar).(no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket(#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: After conferring with counsel and with good cause appearing, the March 1, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC") are vacated and reset for March 7, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. If the parties wish to lodge updated confidential briefs, provide updated participant information, or file an updated Joint Discovery Plan, they must do so on or before March 1, 2023.(no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Due to a conflict involving the Court's calendar, the February 15, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC") are vacated and reset for March 1, 2023 at 2:00 p.m.(no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: After conferring with counsel and with good cause appearing, the Court extends the deadline for the parties to lodge updated confidential briefs, provide updated ENE participant information, or file an updated Joint Discovery Plan to February 9, 2023.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 1/30/2023.(no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Due to a conflict involving the Court's calendar, the February 9, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC") are vacated and reset for February 15, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. If the parties wish to lodge updated confidential briefs, provide updated participant information, or file an updated Joint Discovery Plan, they must do so on or before February 2, 2023. (no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: With good cause appearing, the Court grants the Joint Motion to Continue the January 5, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC"). Dkt. No. 10. The January 5, 2023 ENE and CMC are vacated and reset for February 9, 2023 at 9:30 a.m.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 1/3/2023. (no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Continue January 5, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference by Techsico, Inc.. (Qushair, Ann) (anh). (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Techsico, Inc. (Qushair, Ann) (ave). (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance and Withdrawal by Ann H. Qushair on behalf of Techsico, Inc. (Qushair, Ann)Attorney Ann H. Qushair added to party Techsico, Inc.(pty:dft)(ave). (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Ian Dalby on behalf of Barrett Business Services Inc. (Dalby, David)Attorney David Ian Dalby added to party Barrett Business Services Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/22/2022.(anh) Modified on 11/22/2022 (anh). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Barrett Business Services Inc..(Whittemore, Brian)Attorney Brian S. Whittemore added to party Barrett Business Services Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Techsico, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1). (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Techsico, Inc.. No Parties With Financial Interest. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1). (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Techsico, Inc. (cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17355287.), filed by Techsico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Notice to Adverse Party, #4 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1810-CAB-DEB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less