This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:05:33 (UTC).

Gonzalez Salvador v. Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc et.al.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Gonzalez Salvador filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Shooter's Tiki Bar Grill Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06877

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge Gonzalez Salvador

Defendants

Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc

Edward Migliaccio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine Yesenia Morales

Attorney at Katz Melinger PLLC

280 Madison Avenue, Suite 600

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Scot Lisi

Attorney at Forchelli Curto Deegan Schwartz Mineo & Terrana, LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 1010

Uniondale, NY 11553

Michael Andrew Berger

Attorney at Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 1010

Uniondale, NY 11553

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador. Edward Migliaccio served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scot Lisi on behalf of Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc (aty to be noticed) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL IN ACTION UNDER FLSA & NYLL: The parties are directed to adhere to the instructions in the attached order. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Selection of Mediator due by 1/21/2020) Status Report regarding Settlement is due on 3/2/2020. Mediation shall be completed by 4/16/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/6/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Berger on behalf of Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133409 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#14

(#14) Letter regarding mediator selection by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

10 #1

Stipulation Extending Time

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador. Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, And to So Order the Stipulation by Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter regarding mediator selection by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador. Edward Migliaccio served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador. Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL IN ACTION UNDER FLSA & NYLL: The parties are directed to adhere to the instructions in the attached order. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Selection of Mediator due by 1/21/2020) Status Report regarding Settlement is due on 3/2/2020. Mediation shall be completed by 4/16/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/6/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by 2/6/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/6/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, And to So Order the Stipulation by Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Berger on behalf of Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scot Lisi on behalf of Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc (aty to be noticed) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Edward Migliaccio, Shooter's Tiki Bar & Grill Inc filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133409 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jorge Gonzalez Salvador. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less