Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 07:07:36 (UTC).

Gonzalez Quiroz v. Coffman Specialties, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Gonzalez Quiroz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Coffman Specialties, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and Cathy Ann Bencivengo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01779

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz

Defendants

Coffman Specialties, Inc.

DOES 1 through 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shelly D. Song

100 Bayview Circle, Suite 5500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Reed T. Aljian

Attorney at Daily Aljian LLP

100 Bayview Circle, Suite 5500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Da Hye Song

Attorney at Daily Aljian LLP

100 Bayview Circle, Suite 5500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Daniel Jumyung Hyun

Attorney at Law Office of Daniel J. Hyun

1100 West Town And Country Road, Suite 1250

Orange, CA 92868

Justin Eric David Daily

Attorney at Daily Aljian LLP

100 Bayview Circle, Suite 5500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Khatereh Sage Fahimi

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

501 W Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

Van Allyn Goodwin

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

501 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/16/2020.(anh) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

24 #1

Supplement Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of Defendant's Motion to D

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss all Claims and Compel Arbitration)(Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER on Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [Doc. No. #22 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/13/2020. (anh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#22

(#22) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

16 #3

Request for Judicial Notice in support of motion to dismissa and compel arbitrat

16 #2

Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of motion to dismiss and compel arbitratio

16 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities in support of motion to dismiss all claims and c

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in support of motion to dismiss all claims and compel arbitration, #2 Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of motion to dismiss and compel arbitration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in support of motion to dismissa and compel arbitration)(Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #9

Certificate of Service of Removal

1 #8

Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of Removal to Federal Court

1 #7

Declaration of Khatereh S. Fahimi in support of Removal to Federal Court

1 #6

Exhibit E - Assignment of Rights

1 #5

Exhibit D - Operators Agreement

1 #4

Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons and other initiating docs, including POS thereon

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coffman Specialties, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/16/2020.(anh) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss all Claims and Compel Arbitration)(Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER on Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [Doc. No. #22 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/13/2020. (anh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin E. D. Daily In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss All Claims and Compel Arbitration, #2 Proof of Service)(Hyun, Daniel) (anh). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin E. D. Daily In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss All Claims and Compel Arbitration, #2 Proof of Service)(Daily, Justin) QC EMAIL: Wrong CM/ECF account used for filing. (anh). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz . (Daily, Justin) (anh). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance of Daniel Hyun by Daniel Jumyung Hyun on behalf of Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz (Hyun, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Jumyung Hyun added to party Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz(pty:pla) (anh). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in support of motion to dismiss all claims and compel arbitration, #2 Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of motion to dismiss and compel arbitration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in support of motion to dismissa and compel arbitration)(Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **Withdrawn per doc. no. #18 **MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Da Hye Song In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proof of Service)(Song, Da Hye) (anh). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **Withdrawn per doc. no. #13 ** NOTICE of Appearance of Daniel J. Hyun by Da Hye Song on behalf of Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz (Song, Da Hye) QC Email: Incorrect Filer (anh). (anh). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Da Hye Song by Da Hye Song on behalf of Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz (Song, Da Hye) (anh). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **Withdrawn per doc. no. #12 ** NOTICE of Appearance of Reed Aljian by Da Hye Song on behalf of Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz (Song, Da Hye) QC Email: Incorrect filer (anh). (anh). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **Withdrawn per doc. no. #11 ]** NOTICE of Appearance of Justin Daily by Da Hye Song on behalf of Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz (Song, Da Hye)Attorney Da Hye Song added to party Jose Refugio Gonzalez Quiroz(pty:pla) QC EMAIL: Incorrect filer (anh). (anh). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Van Allyn Goodwin on behalf of Coffman Specialties, Inc. (Goodwin, Van)Attorney Van Allyn Goodwin added to party Coffman Specialties, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coffman Specialties, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Fahimi, Khatereh) (anh). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Coffman Specialties, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Fahimi, Khatereh)(anh). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Diego, case number 37-2020-00022698-CU-OE-TL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14483873.), filed by Coffman Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons and other initiating docs, including POS thereon, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Exhibit D - Operators Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Assignment of Rights, #7 Declaration of Khatereh S. Fahimi in support of Removal to Federal Court, #8 Declaration of Jim Coffman in support of Removal to Federal Court, #9 Certificate of Service of Removal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1779-CAB-AHG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(zda)(sjt). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant