This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2019 at 05:18:15 (UTC).

Gonzales v. Todays Growth Consultant, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2019 Gonzales filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Todays Growth Consultant, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08471

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph M Gonzales

Defendant

Todays Growth Consultant, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Henry Wickert

Attorney at John H. Wickert, Attorney at Law

3400 Dundee Road, Suite 300

Northbrook, IL 60062

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Joseph M Gonzales; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16568862. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Wickert, John) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wickert, John) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for March 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by March 12, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph M Gonzales by John Henry Wickert (Wickert, John) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for March 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by March 12, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Todays Growth Consultant, Inc. (ecw, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph M Gonzales by John Henry Wickert (Wickert, John) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wickert, John) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Joseph M Gonzales; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16568862. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Wickert, John) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.