This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 07:54:20 (UTC).

Gonzales v. Nielsen Holdings plc et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Gonzales filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Nielsen Holdings plc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela K. Chen and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03241

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mauricio Gonzales

Defendants

Nielsen Holdings plc

James A. Attwood, Jr.

David Kenny

Thomas H. Castro

Guerrino De Luca

Karen M. Hoguet

Janice Marinelli Mazza

Jonathan Miller

Stephanie Plaines

Nancy Tellem

Lauren Zalaznick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Sadeh

Attorney at Halper Sadeh LLP

667 Madison Avenue, Ste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mauricio Gonzales (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. In light of the #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is terminated and closed. (Stephan, Keegan) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mauricio Gonzales (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge Ann M Donnelly, Magistrate Judge James R. Cho no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/16/2022. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against James A. Attwood, Jr., Thomas H. Castro, Guerrino De Luca, Karen M. Hoguet, David Kenny, Janice Marinelli Mazza, Jonathan Miller, Nielsen Holdings plc, Stephanie Plaines, Nancy Tellem, Lauren Zalaznick filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15620024 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Mauricio Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nielsen Holdings plc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Sadeh