This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 07:07:12 (UTC).

Gonzales v. California Manufacturing Technology Consulting

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Gonzales filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against California Manufacturing Technology Consulting. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Labson Freeman and Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03678

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilbert V. Gonzales

Defendant

California Manufacturing Technology Consulting

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harmeet K. Dhillon

John-Paul Singh Deol

Michael Ryan Fleming

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gilbert V. Gonzales.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to California Manufacturing Technology Consulting. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/10/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Gilbert V. Gonzales . (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev. 10/20. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Ci vil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gilbert V. Gonzales (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ryan Fleming (Fleming, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John-Paul Singh Deol (Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Gilbert V. Gonzales Re: #1 Complaint filed by Gilbert v. Gonzales. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev.10/20. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Even ts > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Gilbert V. Gonzales (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15976285.). Filed byGilbert V. Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less