5:21-CV-03678
05/17/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
Beth Labson Freeman
Virginia K. DeMarchi
Gilbert V. Gonzales
California Manufacturing Technology Consulting
Harmeet K. Dhillon
John-Paul Singh Deol
Michael Ryan Fleming
Civil Cover Sheet
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gilbert V. Gonzales.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) Summons Issued as to California Manufacturing Technology Consulting. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/10/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Gilbert V. Gonzales . (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev. 10/20. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Ci vil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gilbert V. Gonzales (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ryan Fleming (Fleming, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John-Paul Singh Deol (Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Gilbert V. Gonzales Re: #1 Complaint filed by Gilbert v. Gonzales. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev.10/20. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Even ts > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Gilbert V. Gonzales (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15976285.). Filed byGilbert V. Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read Less