This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 07:40:48 (UTC).

Gontaruk v. Synacor, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Gontaruk filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Synacor, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02128

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Gontaruk

Defendants

Lisa Donohue

Himesh Bhise

CLP SY Holding, LLC

Kevin M. Rendino

Andrew Kau

Synacor, Inc.

Marwan Fawaz

SY Merger Sub Corporation

Michael Montgomery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy John MacFall

Attorney at Rigrodsky Law, P.A.

825 East Gate Boulevard, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Himesh Bhise, CLP SY Holding, LLC, Lisa Donohue, Marwan Fawaz, Andrew Kau, Michael Montgomery, Kevin M. Rendino, SY Merger Sub Corporation, Synacor, Inc.. Document filed by Anthony Gontaruk. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 10, 2021 at 2:45 p.m. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public, and as previously and further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 02:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/26/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-02037. Document filed by Anthony Gontaruk..(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Himesh Bhise, CLP SY Holding, LLC, Lisa Donohue, Marwan Fawaz, Andrew Kau, Michael Montgomery, Kevin M. Rendino, SY Merger Sub Corporation, Synacor, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24238192)Document filed by Anthony Gontaruk..(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Himesh Bhise, CLP SY Holding, LLC, Lisa Donohue, Marwan Fawaz, Andrew Kau, Michael Montgomery, Kevin M. Rendino, SY Merger Sub Corporation, Synacor, Inc.. Document filed by Anthony Gontaruk. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 10, 2021 at 2:45 p.m. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public, and as previously and further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 02:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/26/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-02037-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 21-cv-2037. (jgo) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-02037. Document filed by Anthony Gontaruk..(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Himesh Bhise, CLP SY Holding, LLC, Lisa Donohue, Marwan Fawaz, Andrew Kau, Michael Montgomery, Kevin M. Rendino, SY Merger Sub Corporation, Synacor, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24238192)Document filed by Anthony Gontaruk..(MacFall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synacor, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy John MacFall