This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 11:18:01 (UTC).

Gondrella et al v. PLZ Aeroscience Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Gondrella filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby, Jay C. Zainey and Wendy B Vitter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judges

Jay C. Zainey

Wendy B Vitter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charleste Gondrella

Eric Gondrella

Defendants

PLZ Aeroscience Corporation

AptarGroup, Inc

Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC

Swift Response, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Zachary Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Scott R. Bickford

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Neil Franz Nazareth

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeremy James Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Spencer R. Doody

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Leo Caillier, III

Attorney at Caillier & Associates, LLC

711 2Nd Street

Gretna, LA 70053

Lawrence J. Centola, III

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Jose Rafael Ruiz

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan LLP

755 Magazine Street, New Orleans, La

New Orleans, LA 70130

John Jerry Glas

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Nathaniel Andrew Hamstra

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

191 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

Laurence D. LeSueur, Jr.

Attorney at Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, L.L.C.

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Richard Edward Sarver

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

25 #1

PHV Notice

#25

21 #4

Proposed Order

21 #3

Consent to Electronic Filing

21 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

21 #1

Affidavit

#21

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

3 #3

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #5

Summons AptarGroup, Inc

1 #4

Summons Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC

1 #3

Summons Swift Response, LLC

1 #2

Summons PLZ Aeroscience Corp

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Nathan Hamstra is permitted to appear as a visiting attorney for and on behalf of defendant, AptarGroup, Inc. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING as unopposed #20 Motion to Continue submission Dates. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission dates on the two motions to dismiss (R. Docs. 17 & 19) are RESET for April 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/8/21. (fmm) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. **1.Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. 2.Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION to Continue Submission Date to April 6, 2021 on Rule 12 B6 Motions to Dismiss Doc 17 and Doc 19. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to documents 17 and 19. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan Hamstra (Fee previously paid) by AptarGroup, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Sarver, Richard) Modified text/exparte/referral on 3/8/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date to April 6, 2021 on Rule 12 B6 #17 , #19 Motions to Dismiss by Charleste Gondrella, Eric Gondrella. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nazareth, Neil) Modified text/linkage on 3/8/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC, PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Ruiz, Jose) Responses due by 3/15/2021 (mmv). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 3/23/2021. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AptarGroup, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Sarver, Richard) Modified text/submission date on 3/3/2021 (jeg). Responses due by 3/15/2021 (mmv). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling fee paid from AptarGroup, Inc for Nathan Hamstra re #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (jeg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC, PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jose Rafael Ruiz added to party Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jose Rafael Ruiz added to party PLZ Aeroscience Corporation(pty:dft).(Ruiz, Jose) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request of Summons Issued as to Swift Response, LLC filed by Eric Gondrella, Charleste Gondrella re #1 Complaint,,. (Nazareth, Neil) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by AptarGroup, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Edward Sarver added to party AptarGroup, Inc(pty:dft).(Sarver, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; PLZ Aeroscience Corporation served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Nazareth, Neil) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Nazareth, Neil) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; AptarGroup, Inc served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (Nazareth, Neil) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action is necessary. (lt) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AptarGroup, Inc, Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC, PLZ Aeroscience Corporation, Swift Response, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(lt) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8677016) filed by Eric Gondrella, Charleste Gondrella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons PLZ Aeroscience Corp, #3 Summons Swift Response, LLC, #4 Summons Ball Metalpack Aerosol Container, LLC, #5 Summons AptarGroup, Inc)Attorney Jason Zachary Landry added to party Charleste Gondrella(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Zachary Landry added to party Eric Gondrella(pty:pla).(Landry, Jason) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AptarGroup, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SWIFT RESPONSE LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Edward Sarver(Designation Retained)