This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2022 at 07:20:42 (UTC).

Gomez v. V. Sangiacomo & Sons, et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Gomez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against V Sangiacomo Sons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01537

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andres Gomez

Defendants

V. Sangiacomo & Sons, Limited Partnership

Balbi, Inc.,

V. Sangiacomo & Sons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Centery for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Josie Sue Zimmermann

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Russell Clive Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Greguar Ozhekim

Attorney at Oz Law Group, Inc.

21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Andres Gomez re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/13/2022) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Balbi, Inc.,, V. Sangiacomo & Sons. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. V. Sangiacomo & Sons served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. Balbi, Inc., served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint by not more than 30 days (L.R. 6-1 filed by Balbi, Inc.,, V. Sangiacomo & Sons. (Ozhekim, Greguar) (Filed on 4/14/2022) Modified on 4/18/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Balbi, Inc.,, V. Sangiacomo & Sons (L.R. 3-15) (Ozhekim, Greguar) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Balbi, Inc.,, V. Sangiacomo & Sons (L.R. 3-15) (Ozhekim, Greguar) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint by not more than 30 days (L.R. 6-1 filed by Balbi, Inc.,, V. Sangiacomo & Sons. (Ozhekim, Greguar) (Filed on 4/14/2022) Modified on 4/18/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. Balbi, Inc., served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. V. Sangiacomo & Sons served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Balbi, Inc.,, V. Sangiacomo & Sons. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/13/2022) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Andres Gomez of Association of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zimmermann, Josie) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Andres Gomez re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against V. Sangiacomo & Sons, Balbi, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16982077.). Filed by Andres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/10/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less