This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 07:57:22 (UTC).

GOMEZ v. Tristate Container Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 GOMEZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Tristate Container Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04489

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE GOMEZ

Defendant

Tristate Container Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A SHORE PC

Two Penn Center Suite 1240, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN M. NOLAN, III

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP

Three Parkway Suite 1350, 1601 Cherry St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

ANGELA QUILES NEVAREZ

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

1601 Cherry St Suite 1350, Three Parkway

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOSE GOMEZ As To Dismissal(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA QUILES NEVAREZ on behalf of Tristate Container Corporation with Certificate of Service(NEVAREZ, ANGELA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tristate Container Corporation. Tristate Container Corporation waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of Tristate Container Corporation with Certificate of Service(NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #4

Case Management Track Form Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Jose Gomez against Tristate Container Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14562914.), filed by JOSE GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form Track Form)(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/14/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOSE GOMEZ As To Dismissal(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA QUILES NEVAREZ on behalf of Tristate Container Corporation with Certificate of Service(NEVAREZ, ANGELA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tristate Container Corporation. Tristate Container Corporation waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of Tristate Container Corporation with Certificate of Service(NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Tristate Container Corporation. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/15/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOSE GOMEZ. (lisad, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Jose Gomez against Tristate Container Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14562914.), filed by JOSE GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form Track Form)(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/14/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY