This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 07:56:35 (UTC).

Gomez v. Spadafore, et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Gomez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Spadafore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina M Rodriguez, S. Kato Crews and Regina M. Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03486

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

Presiding Judges

Regina M Rodriguez

Regina M. Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Gomez

Defendants

Chelsea Spadafore

Ecolab Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steve J. Roberts

Attorney at Steve Roberts LLC

100 Fillmore Street, 5Th Floor

Denver, CO 80206

Defendant Attorneys

Manda Leigh Neuman

Attorney at Treece Alfrey Musat, P.C.

633 17Th Street, Suite 2200

Denver, CO 80202

Mark Evans Harris

Attorney at Treece Alfrey Musat, P.C.

633 17Th Street, Suite 2200

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Plaintiff Jessica Gomez. (Roberts, Steve) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#16

(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore. (Harris, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore All parties do not consent.. (Harris, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steve J. Roberts on behalf of Jessica GomezAttorney Steve J. Roberts added to party Jessica Gomez(pty:pla) (Roberts, Steve) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Chelsea Spadafore.(Harris, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Ecolab Inc..(Neuman, Manda) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Manda Leigh Neuman on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Chelsea SpadaforeAttorney Manda Leigh Neuman added to party Ecolab Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Manda Leigh Neuman added to party Chelsea Spadafore(pty:dft) (Neuman, Manda) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#5

(#5) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore, filed by Jessica Gomez.(norlin, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Evans Harris on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore (Harris, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

1 #7

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Plaintiff Jessica Gomez. (Roberts, Steve) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore. (Harris, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 3/2/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore All parties do not consent.. (Harris, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #9 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Manda Leigh Neuman. The s/ signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steve J. Roberts on behalf of Jessica GomezAttorney Steve J. Roberts added to party Jessica Gomez(pty:pla) (Roberts, Steve) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Chelsea Spadafore.(Harris, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2022 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/4/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Ecolab Inc..(Neuman, Manda) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Manda Leigh Neuman on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Chelsea SpadaforeAttorney Manda Leigh Neuman added to party Ecolab Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Manda Leigh Neuman added to party Chelsea Spadafore(pty:dft) (Neuman, Manda) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 12/29/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore, filed by Jessica Gomez.(norlin, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Evans Harris on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore (Harris, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore from Boulder County, District Court, Case Number 2021CV30878. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8245774), filed by Ecolab Inc., Chelsea Spadafore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ECOLAB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Evans Harris