This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 08:42:45 (UTC).

Gomez v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Gomez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23296

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Ramon Gomez

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Gabriel Hassan

11102 Sw 127 Place

Miami, FL 33186

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine Theresa DeSoiza

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich , Voluck, LLP

100 Se Third Avenue, Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Joseph Richard Miele, Jr.

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

100 S.E. Third Avenue, Suite 1500

Ft.Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Jose Ramon Gomez Notice of Agreed Expert Discovery Schedule (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#14

(#14) Initial Disclosure(s) by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#13

(#13) Witness List Expert Witness Disclosure by Jose Ramon Gomez.. (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#12

(#12) Initial Disclosure(s) by Jose Ramon Gomez (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for January 13, 2021, 12:00 p.m.. (Kleinman, Eric) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

#10

(#10) First NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Eric S Kleinman as Mediator. (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Jose Ramon Gomez Notice of Selection of Mediator (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL - Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2020. Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2020. In Limine Motions due by 1/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Motions due by 1/8/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 2/24/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2020 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Joint Scheduling Report and proposed order due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - for Declaratory Relief) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13314898, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (No Answer or Motion to Dismiss filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miele, Joseph) Text Modified on 8/7/2020 (scn) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Jose Ramon Gomez Notice of Agreed Expert Discovery Schedule (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Initial Disclosure(s) by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Witness List Expert Witness Disclosure by Jose Ramon Gomez.. (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial Disclosure(s) by Jose Ramon Gomez (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for January 13, 2021, 12:00 p.m.. (Kleinman, Eric) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Eric S Kleinman as Mediator. (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The correct event is Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing, AND Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator.. (ls) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Jose Ramon Gomez Notice of Selection of Mediator (Hassan, David) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2021 before Judge Ursula Ungaro. (to show year 2021) Per DE #5 (mr1) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL - Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2020. Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2020. In Limine Motions due by 1/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Motions due by 1/8/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 2/24/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2020 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Joint Scheduling Report and proposed order due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - for Declaratory Relief) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13314898, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (No Answer or Motion to Dismiss filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miele, Joseph) Text Modified on 8/7/2020 (scn) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant