This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 07:35:38 (UTC).

Gomez v. North Coast Vineyard Services Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Gomez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against North Coast Vineyard Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01611

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andres Gomez

Defendant

North Coast Vineyard Services Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Sapphire Hill Winery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell Clive Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Zachary Manning Best

Attorney at Centery for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cara Patricia Townsend

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine St., Ste. 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Centery for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Andres Gomez re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to North Coast Vineyard Services Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. North Coast Vineyard Services Inc. served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. North Coast Vineyard Services Inc. served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2022. Parties are directed to Judge Alsup's webpage to view standing orders: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2022) (Entered: 03/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to North Coast Vineyard Services Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Andres Gomez re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16991898.). Filed byAndres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cara Patricia Townsend

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Manning Best

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock