This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2020 at 13:34:34 (UTC).

Gomez v. JPPF 260E161, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Gomez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JPPF 260E161, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02411

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Gomez

Defendants

JPPF 260E161, LP

Starbucks Corp.

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas P. Markovits

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Scott Goldenberg

Joseph Maron Hanna

Justin Thomas Nastro

William Howard Yost

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Justin T. Nastro dated April 3, 2020 re: Removal of this action to this Court. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Scott Goldenberg on behalf of JPPF 260E161, LP..(Goldenberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that, by June 8, 2020, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: (As further set forth herein this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/27/2020) (va) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Howard Yost on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Yost, William) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Thomas Nastro on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Markovits on behalf of Anthony Gomez..(Markovits, Thomas) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Anthony Gomez.(Markovits, Thomas) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

4 #4

Affidavit of Service

4 #3

Certificate of Service

4 #2

Exhibit B - Supplemental CPLR 3017(c) Demand

4 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Action Docketed Pleadings

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33504/2019E..Document filed by Starbucks Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action Docketed Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental CPLR 3017(c) Demand, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service).(Hanna, Joseph) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33504/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19167622).Document filed by Starbucks Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service).(Hanna, Joseph) Modified on 3/20/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Justin T. Nastro dated April 3, 2020 re: Removal of this action to this Court. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Scott Goldenberg on behalf of JPPF 260E161, LP..(Goldenberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that, by June 8, 2020, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: (As further set forth herein this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/27/2020) (va) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Howard Yost on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Yost, William) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Thomas Nastro on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Markovits on behalf of Anthony Gomez..(Markovits, Thomas) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Anthony Gomez.(Markovits, Thomas) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33504/2019E..Document filed by Starbucks Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action Docketed Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental CPLR 3017(c) Demand, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service).(Hanna, Joseph) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Maron Hanna. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Maron Hanna to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, all exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Starbucks Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Hanna, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hanna, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33504/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19167622).Document filed by Starbucks Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service).(Hanna, Joseph) Modified on 3/20/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less