This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:45:04 (UTC).

Gomez v. Huneeus Wines LLC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 Gomez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Huneeus Wines LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02528

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andres Gomez

Defendant

Huneeus Wines LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Christopher A. Seabock

Josie Sue Zimmermann

Defendant Attorney

Hayley Singer Grunvald

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time for Joint Site Inspection.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

14 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

13 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

13 #2

Declaration of Andres Gomez

13 #1

Declaration of Dennis Price

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. Huneeus Wines LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2022) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2022. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

10 #10

Main Document

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#7

(#7) ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Andres Gomez. (Zimmermann, Josie) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Huneeus Wines LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

1 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time for Joint Site Inspection.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case To Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Initial Complaint and for Joint Inspection filed by Huneeus Wines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Grunvald, Hayley) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Response to Order to Show Cause #11 Order to Show Cause byAndres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis Price, #2 Declaration of Andres Gomez, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2022) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Gomez. Huneeus Wines LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2022) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2022. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 05/02/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Andres Gomez. (Zimmermann, Josie) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Huneeus Wines LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/10/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Andres Gomez re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17118865.). Filed byAndres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less