This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2021 at 07:23:30 (UTC).

Gomez v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Gomez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23507

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald O. Gomez

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Devin C. Reid

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square

701 Poydras St., SUIT 5000

Georgia Lee Lucier

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Scott C. Seiler

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

#4

#5

#6

#7

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

8 #1

*Restricted*

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Scott C. Seiler, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Devin C. Reid, Georgia Lee Lucier, Kevin Michael Hodges, mailing date October 5, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00801. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb). (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/4/2021.(sa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that, no later than 9/3/2021, plaintiffs Braulio Lemus-Hernandez, Vernon Lee Clemons, and Ronald O. Gomez must provide full and complete initialdisclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiff and their counsel must appear before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline by which Braulio Lemus-Hernandez, Vernon Lee Clemons, and Ronald O. Gomez must submit a venue filing is extended to no later than 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/4/2021. (NEF: Sect J) Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/4/2021.(caa) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/15. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8825724) filed by Ronald O. Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Ronald O. Gomez(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY