This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2020 at 10:13:28 (UTC).

Daniel Gomez v. Activar Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Daniel Gomez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Activar Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05693

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Gomez

Defendants

Activar Construction Products Group, Inc.

Activar Inc.

Does 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J S Calvo

James R Hawkins

Gregory E. Mauro

Defendant Attorneys

Wendy A Sugg

Mary Heath

Charles G Frohman

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Answer

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Mary Health APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc., designating Wendy A Sugg as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Chrles G. Frohman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc., designating Wendy A Sugg as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles G. Frohman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/2/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-27054199) filed by Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sugg, Wendy) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mary Heath to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27054425) filed by Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sugg, Wendy) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mary Heath on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles G Frohman on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1)(ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc., Does 1-50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Daniel Gomez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/14/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc., identifying Activar Inc.. (Sugg, Wendy) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc.. (Sugg, Wendy) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV18752 Receipt No: ACACDC-26963458 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Activar Construction Products Group, Inc., Activar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer, #3 Declaration) (Attorney Wendy A Sugg added to party Activar Construction Products Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy A Sugg added to party Activar Inc.(pty:dft))(Sugg, Wendy) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less