This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2022 at 12:41:43 (UTC).

Antonio Gomez et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Antonio Gomez filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Antonio Gomez

Cecilia Gomez

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tionna Dolin

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1888 Century Park East Floor 19

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ariel Harman-Holmes

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor, 90067

Los Angeles, CA 91411

Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Karin Kuemerle

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christine J Haw

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kareem Shereef Aref

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew Jeffrey Pardo

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Defendants FCA US LLC, Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#27

(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Antonio Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Cecilia Gomez(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#26

(#26) ORDER RE: PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS SO ORDERED. re Stipulation for Protective Order #25 (vm) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

25 #1

Proposed Order

25 #25

Main Document

24 #1

Proposed Order

24 #24

Main Document

#23

(#23) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed counsel for Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez. Adding Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed as counsel of record for Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez. (Attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed added to party Antonio Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed added to party Cecilia Gomez(pty:pla))(Sadeghi-Movahed, Negeen) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez (Haw, Christine) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #3

Answer to Complaint - Dealer - State Court

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Defendants FCA US LLC, Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Antonio Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Cecilia Gomez(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER RE: PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS SO ORDERED. re Stipulation for Protective Order #25 (vm) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Civil Trial Preparation Order from Pre-Trial Conf 6/6/22 & Trial 6/14/22 to Pre-Trial Conf 12/5/22 & Trial 12/12/22 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed counsel for Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez. Adding Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed as counsel of record for Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Antonio Gomez and Cecilia Gomez. (Attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed added to party Antonio Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed added to party Cecilia Gomez(pty:pla))(Sadeghi-Movahed, Negeen) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez (Haw, Christine) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kareem Shereef Aref on behalf of Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Antonio Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Cecilia Gomez(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Antonio Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Cecilia Gomez(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REQUEST for Leave of Christine Haw to Appear for Remote filed by Plaintiffs' Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez. Request set for hearing on 2/28/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Remote Appearance at the February 28, 2022 Initial Status Conference) (Haw, Christine) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC, Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Antonio Gomez, Cecilia Gomez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV44627 Receipt No: ACACDC-32663112 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court, #3 Answer to Complaint - Dealer - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM DBA SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot