Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2020 at 09:31:38 (UTC).

Gomes v. US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Gomes filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea K. Johnstone and Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Robson Xavier Gomes

Defendants and Respondents

US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary

Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director

Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

John P. Newman

Attorney at Newman Law Office PLLC

15 High St

Manchester, NH 03101

Laurel Gilbert

Attorney at Hinckley Allen & Snyder

28 State St

Boston, MA 02109-1775

W. Daniel Deane

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

900 Elm St, 14Th Flr

Manchester, NH 03101-2031

Colin Missett

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

53 State St

Boston, MA 02109-2835

Henry Klementowicz

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301

Ronald L. Abramson

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

180 Bridge St

Manchester, NH 03104

Henry Clay Quillen

Attorney at Whatley Kallas LLP

159 Middle Street, Suite 2C

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Gilles R. Bissonnette

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301

Nathan P. Warecki

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

900 Elm St, 14Th Flr

Manchester, NH 03101-2031

Behzad Mirhashem (FPD)

Attorney at Federal Defender's Office

The Ralph Pill Bldg, 22 Bridge St

Concord, NH 03301

Timothy C. Ayer

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

140 Washington St, Po Box 977

Dover, NH 03821-0977

W. Scott O'Connell

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

900 Elm St, 14Th Flr

Manchester, NH 03101-2031

Marx Calderon

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

53 State St

Boston, MA 02109-2835

SangYeob Kim

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301

Respondent Attorneys

Kasey A Weiland

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Terry L. Ollila

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Robert J. Rabuck

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Frances Susan Cohen

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

53 Pleasant Street, Ste 4Th Floor

Concord, NH 03301

John S. Davis

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Georgiana L. Konesky

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#198

RESTRICTED

#197

RESTRICTED

#196

RESTRICTED

#195

(#195) MODIFIED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Relative to Class Member Zeike Reyes Pujols. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#194

RESTRICTED

#192

RESTRICTED

#191

RESTRICTED

#190

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER Regarding Service and deadlines as outlined within. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

1 #5

/s/ Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

*Restricted*

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ANHDC-1964018.) filed by Robson Xavier Gomes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Robert Greifinger, MD, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) 2, Affidavit of Bire Williams, M.D., #3 Exhibit 3, Declaration of Susan Church, #4 Exhibit 4, Civil Cover Sheet)(Newman, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2020: #5 /s/ Civil Cover Sheet) (mc). (Entered: 04/15/2020)

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) NOTICE of Transfer for Purposes of Removal - Week of June 15, 2020 by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary.(Cohen, Frances) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#197) NOTICE of Transfer for Purposes of Removal (Amended) re: Kevin Daniel Shirley by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary.(Cohen, Frances) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing. Special Hearing/ Bail Hearing for Emerson Garcia-Alvarez set for 6/15/2020 at 12:15 PM via video conference before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#196) NOTICE of Intent to Remove Kevin Daniel from Strafford DOC by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary.(Cohen, Frances) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) MODIFIED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Relative to Class Member Zeike Reyes Pujols. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Evidentiary Hearing via Video Conference (Morning Session) held on 6/1/2020. Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock, Telephone # 603 225-1454. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number.NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 7/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 7/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2020.(de) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) STATUS REPORT by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary : Weekly Status Report (6.3.20 - 6.10.20)(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #190 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) REPLY to Objection to Motion re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary. Surreply due by 6/15/2020. (Cohen, Frances) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) Assented to MOTION to Exceed page limitations filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary.(Cohen, Frances) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
264 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Robson Xavier Gomes. HEARING REQUESTED.Follow up on Objection on 5/4/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit H - Declaration of Dora Schriro, #3 Exhibit I - Affidavit of John Burlock, #4 Exhibit J - Affidavit of Pedro Gonzalez Cuarca, #5 Proposed Order)(Warecki, Nathan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Robson Xavier Gomes and Additional Petitioners Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Robson Xavier Gomes(pty:pla).(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robson Xavier Gomes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Declaration of Nathan P. Warecki, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Warecki Dec. - Declaration of Dr. Marc Stern, #3 Exhibit B to Warecki Dec. - Declaration of Dr. Jonathan Louis Golob, #4 Exhibit C to Warecki Dec. - Affidavit of SangYeob Kim, Esq., #5 Exhibit D to Warecki Dec. - Affidavit of Darwin Aliesky Cuesta-Rojas, #6 Exhibit E to Warecki Dec. - Affidavit of Jose Nolberto Tacuri-Tacuri, #7 Exhibit F to Warecki Dec. - Affidavit of Robson Xavier Gomes, #8 Exhibit G to Warecki Dec. - Declaration of John Sandweg, Esq.)(Warecki, Nathan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Class Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Robson Xavier Gomes.(Warecki, Nathan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan P. Warecki on behalf of Robson Xavier Gomes Attorney Nathan P. Warecki added to party Robson Xavier Gomes(pty:pla).(Warecki, Nathan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Regarding Service and deadlines as outlined within. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-453-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ANHDC-1964018.) filed by Robson Xavier Gomes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Robert Greifinger, MD, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) 2, Affidavit of Bire Williams, M.D., #3 Exhibit 3, Declaration of Susan Church, #4 Exhibit 4, Civil Cover Sheet)(Newman, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2020: #5 /s/ Civil Cover Sheet) (mc). (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasey Weiland