This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 07:16:16 (UTC).

GOMBEDA v. SYNCHRONY BANK

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 GOMBEDA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SYNCHRONY BANK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD GOMBEDA

Defendant

SYNCHRONY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Shaffer, Jr

Attorney at Starks Law, PC

1422 W Street Rd., Ste 2

Warminster, PA 18974

Defendant Attorney

SAMANTHA J. CHUGH

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

225 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Arbitration Procedural Order 03/15/2022 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/28/2022 10:00 AM.(sah) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#12

(#12) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(Shaffer, John) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

11 #1

CONSENT FORM

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Trial Procedures

10 #1

Conf. Info Sheet

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint (First) by SYNCHRONY BANK.(CHUGH, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF EDWARD GOMBEDA HAS FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT #6 , DEFENDANT SYNCHRONY BANKS MOTION TO DISMISS #4 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/22/22.2/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

7 #3

state court record

7 #2

state court record

7 #1

state court record

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against SYNCHRONY BANK, filed by EDWARD GOMBEDA.(Shaffer, John) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/15/2022 per chambers) (lisad, ). Modified on 2/15/2022 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THE MATTER LABLED GOMEDA V. SYNCHRONY BANK, CASE NO. 2021-024113 WAS REMOVED FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA TO THIS COURT, AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY MUST BE FILED WITH THIS COURT. THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/9/22. 2/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED.(bw) Modified on 2/10/2022 (bw). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Arbitration Procedural Order 03/15/2022 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/28/2022 10:00 AM.(sah) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(Shaffer, John) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing:PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/5/2022 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Conf. Info Sheet, #2 Trial Procedures)(ahf) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint (First) by SYNCHRONY BANK.(CHUGH, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF EDWARD GOMBEDA HAS FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT #6 , DEFENDANT SYNCHRONY BANKS MOTION TO DISMISS #4 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/22/22.2/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 state court record, #2 state court record, #3 state court record)(afm) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against SYNCHRONY BANK, filed by EDWARD GOMBEDA.(Shaffer, John) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/15/2022 per chambers) (lisad, ). Modified on 2/15/2022 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDOC. 5 MAILED TO COUNSEL WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (sg) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE MATTER LABLED GOMEDA V. SYNCHRONY BANK, CASE NO. 2021-024113 WAS REMOVED FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA TO THIS COURT, AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY MUST BE FILED WITH THIS COURT. THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/9/22. 2/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED.(bw) Modified on 2/10/2022 (bw). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SYNCHRONY BANK.Memorandum in Support; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHUGH, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT (Designation Form) to Notice of Removal by SYNCHRONY BANK.. (CHUGH, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Synchrony Financial with Certificate of Service by SYNCHRONY BANK.(CHUGH, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYNCHRONY BANK (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15674890), filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form)(CHUGH, SAMANTHA) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/20/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha J Chugh(Designation Retained)